Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2802581
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014378463Global Dossier 25.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201314371565 11.01.2013
WO2013IB50273 11.01.2013
US201261586552 13.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2802581Global Dossier 19.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013IB50273 11.01.2013
US201261586552 13.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013105058Global Dossier 18.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261586552 13.01.2012