Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810526

EP2810526 - DEVICES AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING EXTENDED TIME PERIODS FOR MAINTAINING PPP SESSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.08.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.09.2015  [2015/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / PATWARDHAN, Ravindra Manohar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / ATTAR, Rashid Ahmed Akbar
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13705656.001.02.2013
WO2013US24459
Priority number, dateUS201261594914P03.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261594914 P
US20131374791323.01.2013         Original published format: US201313747913
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013116737
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810526
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/04, H04W76/06
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG ERWEITERTER ZEITPERIODEN ZUR AUFRECHTERHALTUNG VON PPP-SITZUNGEN[2014/50]
English:DEVICES AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING EXTENDED TIME PERIODS FOR MAINTAINING PPP SESSIONS[2014/50]
French:DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PROPOSER DES PÉRIODES DE TEMPS ÉTENDUES EN VUE DE MAINTENIR DES SESSIONS PPP[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.07.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
21.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/38]
21.03.2015Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
29.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2015/38]
29.04.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2007230393  (SINHA SHAILENDRA [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-12,14-19,21-23,25-29,31-36,38-42,44-46,48 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] *;
 [Y]EP1619906  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [Y] 1-5,7-12,14-19,21-23,25-29,31-36,38-42,44-46,48 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0039] *;
 [A]  - AGRAWAL P ET AL, "Mobility and session management: UMTS vs. cdma2000", IEEE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20040801), vol. 11, no. 4, doi:10.1109/MWC.2004.1325889, ISSN 1536-1284, pages 30 - 43, XP011117200 [A] 1-48 * pages 36-37, chapter "Session Management" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWC.2004.1325889
 [A]  - JUI-HUNG YEH ET AL, "Comparative Analysis of Energy-Saving Techniques in 3GPP and 3GPP2 Systems", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20090101), vol. 58, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TVT.2008.923687, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 432 - 448, XP011226380 [A] 1-48 * page 440, chapter "State machines and Energy Conservation" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TVT.2008.923687
 [T]  - RASHID ATTAR ET AL, "Enhancements to CDMA2000 1x for M2M communications", GLOBECOM WORKSHOPS (GC WKSHPS), 2012 IEEE, IEEE, (20121203), doi:10.1109/GLOCOMW.2012.6477837, ISBN 978-1-4673-4942-0, pages 1675 - 1680, XP032341637 [T] * page 1679, section "Increase PPP inactivity timer" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOMW.2012.6477837