Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828397

EP2828397 - GRAM STAINING METHOD WITH IMPROVED DECOLORIZATION OF THE CRYSTAL VIOLET-IODINE COMPLEX FROM GRAM NEGATIVE BACTERIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ventana Medical Systems, Inc.
1910 Innovation Park Drive
Tucson, AZ 85755 / US
[2018/08]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Ventana Medical Systems, Inc.
1910 E. Innovation Park Drive
Tucson, Arizona 85755 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WEIDNER, Charles
24990 South Sunburst Drive
Tucson, Arizona 85739 / US
02 / CONNOLLY, Cynthia
8366 W. Calle Sancho Panza
Tucson, Arizona 85757 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Burger, Alexander
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Patentabteilung
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Burger, Alexander
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52
82372 Penzberg / DE
Application number, filing date13705765.922.02.2013
[2018/26]
WO2013EP53510
Priority number, dateUS201261612520P19.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261612520 P
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013139554
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828397
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2828397
Date:27.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/04
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GRAM-VERFÄRBUNGSVERFAHREN MIT VERBESSERTER ENTFÄRBUNG DES KRISTALLINEN VIOLETTJODKOMPLEXES AUS GRAM-NEGATIVEN BAKTERIEN[2015/05]
English:GRAM STAINING METHOD WITH IMPROVED DECOLORIZATION OF THE CRYSTAL VIOLET-IODINE COMPLEX FROM GRAM NEGATIVE BACTERIA[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COLORATION GRAM AVEC UNE DÉCOLORATION AMÉLIORÉE DU CRISTAL VIOLET-COMPLEXE D'IODE À PARTIR DE BACTÉRIES GRAM NÉGATIF[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase20.10.2014National basic fee paid 
20.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
25.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2018Fee for grant paid
18.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.04.2017
Opposition(s)28.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
[2019/45]
Former [2019/37]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/11]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/09]EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/08]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/03]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/52]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/51]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/50]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/49]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
NO27.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[YD]WO2010080287  (VENTANA MED SYST INC [US]; KRAM BRIAN H [US]; RIZZO VINCENT R [US]) [YD] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [XY]EP2022858  (YE YING [CN]) [X] 1-4,10,12,13,16,21,22,25,26 * paragraph [0006] * * example 3 * [Y] 1-27;
 [XY]CN1392266  (ZHANG HUA [CN]) [X] 1-4,10,12,13,16,21,22,25,26 * page 5 - page 6 * [Y] 1-27;
 [ID]US6352861  (COPELAND KEITH G [US] ET AL) [ID] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [XY]JPS5820198  (NISHIOKA MITSUO; NISSUI SEIYAKU CO) [X] 1,10 * abstract * [Y] 1-27
by applicantUS2739922
 US3898326
 US6352861
 US5654200
 US6582962
 US6296809
 US5595707
    - Pierce Catalog and Handbook, PIERCE CHEMICAL CO., pages 1994 - 1995
    - CARSON F; HLADIK C, Histotechnology: A Self Instructional Text, 3rd edition,, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL PATHOLOGY PRESS, (2009), pages 231 - 233
 WO2009US67042