Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2822492

EP2822492 - DISPENSING DEVICE FOR PRESSURIZED CONTAINERS FOR THE APPLICATION OF CRYOGENIC COOLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.06.2017  [2017/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sixtem Life S.r.l.
Via Emilio Boni 19
59100 Prato (PO) / IT
[2017/15]
Former [2015/03]For all designated states
Sixtem Life S.r.l.
Via Adige 34
50019 Sesto Fiorentino / IT
Inventor(s)01 / OTTANELLI, Luciano
c/o SIXTEM LIFE Srl
Via Adige 34
I-50019 Sesto Fiorentino (FI) / IT
 [2015/03]
Representative(s)Vinci, Marcello
Ufficio Veneto Brevetti Via Sorio 116
35141 Padova / IT
[2015/03]
Application number, filing date13705839.211.01.2013
WO2013IB50267
Priority number, dateIT2012PD0007409.03.2012         Original published format: IT PD20120074
[2015/03]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013132357
Date:12.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2822492
Date:14.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013
[2015/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/02, B65D83/40, B65D83/20
[2015/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/03]
TitleGerman:ABGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR DRUCKBEHÄLTER ZUM AUFTRAGEN EINES KRYOGENEN KÄLTEMITTELS[2015/03]
English:DISPENSING DEVICE FOR PRESSURIZED CONTAINERS FOR THE APPLICATION OF CRYOGENIC COOLANT[2015/03]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION POUR RÉCIPIENTS MIS SOUS PRESSION POUR L'APPLICATION D'UN RÉFRIGÉRANT CRYOGÉNIQUE[2015/03]
Entry into regional phase05.09.2014National basic fee paid 
05.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
03.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.05.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2008093372  (SIXTEM LIFE S R L [IT]; CITTERIO MAURO [IT]; OTTANELLI LUCIANO [IT]) [Y] 1-10 * figures 5a-5c,6a,6b *;
 [X]US2005043723  (HOWLETT HAROLD A [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4-9 * figures 1,2,9,10,15,21,22,25,26,27 *;
 [Y]EP1867295  (KONINK UTERMOEHLEN N V [NL]) [Y] 1-10 * figure 1 *;
 [A]GB1255666  (GOLDBERGER ERNST [CH]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-7 *