Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806805

EP2806805 - APPARATUS FOR HEART VALVE REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/49]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HEART VALVE REPAIR
[2015/52]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
St. Jude Medical, Inc.
One St. Jude Medical Drive
St. Paul, MN 55117 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / MORRIS, Benjamin, E.
3204 Heritage Heights Way
Jeffersonville, Indiana 47130 / US
02 / BIELEFELD, Eric, E.
9300 Clyde Court
Floyds Knobs, Indiana 47119 / US
03 / FURNISH, Gregory, R.
2614 Top Hill Road
Louisville, Kentucky 40206 / US
04 / JOHNSON, Wayne
2301 Centennial Blvd.
Jeffersonville, Indiana 47130 / US
05 / GRIFFIN, Mark
1802 Strand Avenue
Louisville, Kentucky 40205 / US
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date13705856.625.01.2013
[2016/21]
WO2013US23077
Priority number, dateUS201261590475P25.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261590475 P
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112795
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806805
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2806805
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/128, A61F2/24
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR REPARATUR EINER HERZKLAPPE[2015/52]
English:APPARATUS FOR HEART VALVE REPAIR[2015/52]
French:APPAREIL DE RÉPARATION DE VALVULE CARDIAQUE[2015/52]
Former [2014/49]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REPARATUR EINER HERZKLAPPE
Former [2014/49]APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR HEART VALVE REPAIR
Former [2014/49]APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION DE VALVULE CARDIAQUE
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
12.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2016Fee for grant paid
06.04.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.04.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.12.2015
Opposition(s)28.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.01.2013
AL25.05.2016
AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE25.01.2017
LU25.01.2017
MT25.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
[2019/39]
Former [2019/31]HU25.01.2013
AL25.05.2016
AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE25.01.2017
LU25.01.2017
MT25.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2018/46]AL25.05.2016
AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE25.01.2017
LU25.01.2017
MT25.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2018/43]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE25.01.2017
LU25.01.2017
MT25.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2018/13]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
IE25.01.2017
LU25.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
LU25.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/50]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/47]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
SM25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RS25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT25.05.2016
NO25.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO03049619  (LATTOUF OMAR M [US]) [X] 10,12-19 * page 10 - page 11; figures 15-17 * [I] 11;
 [XI]WO9900059  (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [X] 10,12,15-17,19 * page 9; figures 3,4,6 * [I] 11;
 [E]WO2013019415  (ST JUDE MEDICAL [US], et al) [E] 10-21 * figures 2a-2e, 12 *