Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809987

EP2809987 - OPTICAL SYSTEM AND LIGHTING DEVICE COMPRISED THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Lighting Solutions, LLC
1975 Noble Road, Nela Park, Bld. 338
Cleveland, OH 44112 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / YODER, Benjamin, Lee
1975 Noble Road
East Cleveland, OH 44112-6300 / US
02 / KAMINSKI, Mark, Edward
1975 Noble Road
East Cleveland, OH 44112-6300 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth , et al
Global Patent Operations Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[2016/36]
Former [2014/50]Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth , et al
Global Patent Operation - Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date13705865.730.01.2013
[2016/36]
WO2013US23853
Priority number, dateUS20121336594903.02.2012         Original published format: US201213365949
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013116343
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809987
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809987
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:F21V5/04, F21V7/00, F21V13/04, F21Y115/10
[2016/17]
Former International [2014/50]F21V5/04, F21V7/00, F21V13/04, F21Y101/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:OPTISCHES SYSTEM UND BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAVON[2014/50]
English:OPTICAL SYSTEM AND LIGHTING DEVICE COMPRISED THEREOF[2014/50]
French:SYSTÈME OPTIQUE ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE COMPOSÉ DE CELUI-CI[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2014National basic fee paid 
03.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
18.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2016Fee for grant paid
21.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2015
Opposition(s)08.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.01.2013
AL07.09.2016
AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
GB30.01.2017
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
MT30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/47]AL07.09.2016
AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
GB30.01.2017
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
MT30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2018/43]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
GB30.01.2017
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
MT30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2018/13]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
GB30.01.2017
IE30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/51]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
GB30.01.2017
LU30.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/50]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
Former [2017/45]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
MC07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/37]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SI07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
DK07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT07.09.2016
BE07.09.2016
CZ07.09.2016
EE07.09.2016
ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
IT07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
PL07.09.2016
RO07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
SK07.09.2016
SM07.09.2016
BG07.12.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
IS07.01.2017
PT09.01.2017
Former [2017/13]ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
LV07.09.2016
NL07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
Former [2017/11]ES07.09.2016
FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
GR08.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI07.09.2016
HR07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
RS07.09.2016
SE07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI07.09.2016
LT07.09.2016
NO07.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT07.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[XI]US1986065  (ANDRE MAILLET ANTOINE) [X] 1,2,4,6-10,12-16,22 * page 2, column 1, line 20 - line 53 * * figures 4-6 * [I] 3,17-19,21;
 [XI]EP0828112  (VALEO VISION [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-8,12,14,15,22 * figures 2, 3, 9 * [I] 11,17-19,21;
 [XI]WO2008089757  (DKI PLAST AS [DK]; GUDUM JENS [DK]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10,12,14,16,22 * figures 2, 3, 6, 7 * [I] 11,17,19-21;
 [XI]EP1524468  (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [X] 1,5,7,8,10,12,13,16 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0028] - [0030] * [I] 3,11,17,19,21;
 [XI]US2008144328  (YAGI TAKAYUKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,4,6,7,12,14,17,18,22 * figures 4, 16 * [I] 11,21;
 [XI]US2006109669  (TANAKA HIDETADA [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,10,12,14,17 * figure 14 * [I] 11,21