EP2812678 - VISUALLY INSPECTING OPTICAL FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Connectivity Belgium BVBA Diestsesteenweg 692 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | [2017/09] |
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Raychem BVBA Diestsesteenweg 692 3010 Kessel-Lo / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIN, Marvin Wieteschstrasse 14 48431 Rheine / DE | 02 /
MAKSIMOVIC, Milan Esdoornlaan 20 NL-7421 AX Deventer / NL | 03 /
VAN DEN EIJKEL, Gerard Cornelis De Esch 8 NL-7582 BN Losser / NL | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [2014/51] | Application number, filing date | 13705932.5 | 01.02.2013 | WO2013EP52032 | Priority number, date | US201261596038P | 07.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261596038 P | US201361757510P | 28.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361757510 P | [2014/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013117497 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2812678 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/896, G01M11/00, G01N21/952 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
G01M11/37 (EP,US);
G01M11/30 (US);
G01M11/35 (EP,US);
G01N21/896 (EP,US);
G01N21/958 (EP,US);
G06T7/0008 (US);
G01N2021/8832 (EP,US);
G01N2021/9511 (EP,US);
G01N21/952 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10004 (US);
G06T2207/10016 (US);
G06T2207/10152 (US);
G06T2207/30108 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Title | German: | VISUELLE ÜBERPRÜFUNG VON GLASFASERN | [2014/51] | English: | VISUALLY INSPECTING OPTICAL FIBERS | [2014/51] | French: | CONTRÔLE VISUEL DE FIBRES OPTIQUES | [2014/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 19.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 02.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP0506401 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 33-35,39,40,43,44 * the whole document * [Y] 41,42 [I] 36-38; | [A]WO9303350 (BIRKLE SENSOR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 24-32 * abstract * * page 11, lines 17,18 *; | [A]DE4226203 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 33-44 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0766082 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 33-44 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19713973 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 24-32 * the whole document *; | [A]US5953113 (POFFENBARGER STEVEN LEWIS [US]) [A] 33-44* the whole document *; | [A]DE19813073 (LASER SORTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,15 * abstract *; | [A]US6122045 (PIKE JOHN NAZARIAN [US], et al) [A] 24-32 * abstract *; | [XY]US2002054285 (TODO SHINPEI [JP], et al) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0029] - [0032]; figure 1 * [Y] 2-14,16-23; | [X]WO03016854 (PERMANOVA LASERSYSTEM AB [SE], et al) [X] 33,39 * the whole document *; | [XA]US2004066505 (BERG DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 24-28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] - [0020] * [A] 29-32; | [XA]DE10312051 (VITRONIC DR ING STEIN BILDVERA [DE]) [X] 24-28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0041] * [A] 29-32; | [Y]WO2005095930 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 4-14,16-23 * abstract *; | [XYI]WO2007131257 (PROFACTOR RES AND SOLUTIONS GM [AT], et al) [X] 24-28 * the whole document * [Y] 41,42 [I] 29-32; | [Y]US2008144044 (EHRICK MICHAEL R [US]) [Y] 2-14,16-23 * paragraph [0020]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1980843 (ESSILOR INT [FR]) [A] 1,15 * abstract * | Examination | US6677591 |