Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2817540

EP2817540 - SEALING ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trelleborg Sealing Solutions Germany GmbH
Handwerkstrasse 5-7
70565 Stuttgart / DE
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / JORDAN, Holger
Novizenweg 140
73765 Neuhausen a.d.F. / DE
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[2017/14]
Former [2015/01]Kohler Schmid Möbus
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date13705954.913.02.2013
[2017/14]
WO2013EP52850
Priority number, dateDE20121020257120.02.2012         Original published format: DE102012202571
[2015/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013124192
Date:29.08.2013
Language:DE
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2817540
Date:31.12.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2817540
Date:05.04.2017
Language:DE
[2017/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/32, F16J15/56
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DICHTUNGSANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2015/01]
English:SEALING ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF[2015/01]
French:ENSEMBLE D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2014National basic fee paid 
22.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
07.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2017Fee for grant paid
17.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.10.2016
Opposition(s)08.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipEE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MC05.04.2017
MT05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
[2018/44]
Former [2018/43]EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
MT05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/25]EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SI05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/11]EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
SM05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/10]EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
RO05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
SK05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2018/09]EE05.04.2017
FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/50]FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
LV05.04.2017
RS05.04.2017
BG05.07.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Former [2017/49]FI05.04.2017
HR05.04.2017
LT05.04.2017
NO05.07.2017
GR06.07.2017
IS05.08.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US3092427  (SADLER HARRY J, et al) [X] 1-4,12-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0253086  (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE STEUERUNG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 1 - line 57; figure 2 *
by applicantDE19513727