Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815493

EP2815493 - AC/DC ELECTRICAL CONVERSION DEVICE PERMITTING ENERGY RECOVERY AND MANAGEMENT OF DC-SIDE SHORT-CIRCUITS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/52]AC/DC ELECTRICAL CONVERSION DEVICE PERMITTING ENERGY RECOVERY AND MANAGEMENT OF DC-SIDE SHORT-CIRCUITS
[2015/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Technology GmbH
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
[2016/15]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
ALSTOM Technology Ltd
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Inventor(s)01 / GARCIA-SOTO, Guillermo
2A rue La Pérouse
91300 Massy / FR
 [2016/13]
Former [2014/52]01 / GARCIA-SOTO, Guillermo
2A rue La Pérouse
F-91300 Massy / FR
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2014/52]
Application number, filing date13705970.514.02.2013
[2016/13]
WO2013EP53015
Priority number, dateFR2012005150717.02.2012         Original published format: FR 1251507
[2014/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013120966
Date:22.08.2013
Language:FR
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815493
Date:24.12.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2815493
Date:30.03.2016
Language:FR
[2016/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/158, H02M7/219, H02M1/32
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHE AC/DC-UMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ENERGIERÜCKGEWINNUNG UND VERWALTUNG VON GLEICHSTROMSEITIGEN KURZSCHLÜSSEN UND STEUERVERFAHREN EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG[2015/38]
English:AC/DC ELECTRICAL CONVERSION DEVICE PERMITTING ENERGY RECOVERY AND MANAGEMENT OF DC-SIDE SHORT-CIRCUITS AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF[2015/38]
French:DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION ÉLECTRIQUE AC/DC AUTORISANT UNE RÉCUPÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE ET UNE GESTION DES COURTS-CIRCUITS CÔTÉ CONTINU ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF[2015/38]
Former [2014/52]ELEKTRISCHE AC/DC-UMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ENERGIERÜCKGEWINNUNG UND VERWALTUNG VON GLEICHSTROMSEITIGEN KURZSCHLÜSSEN
Former [2014/52]AC/DC ELECTRICAL CONVERSION DEVICE PERMITTING ENERGY RECOVERY AND MANAGEMENT OF DC-SIDE SHORT-CIRCUITS
Former [2014/52]DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION ÉLECTRIQUE AC/DC AUTORISANT UNE RÉCUPÉRATION D'ÉNERGIE ET UNE GESTION DES COURTS-CIRCUITS CÔTÉ CONTINU
Entry into regional phase19.08.2014National basic fee paid 
19.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
25.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2016Fee for grant paid
15.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2015
Opposition(s)03.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.02.2013
AL30.03.2016
AT30.03.2016
BG30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MT30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
[2019/47]
Former [2019/39]HU14.02.2013
AL30.03.2016
AT30.03.2016
BG30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MT30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2019/31]HU14.02.2013
AL30.03.2016
AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MT30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2018/46]AL30.03.2016
AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MT30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2018/43]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MT30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/48]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/37]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/04]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/48]HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/44]HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/39]HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/36]HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/35]HR30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2009160248  (ANG WANLENG [JP]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0054]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]GB2447875  (WOLFSON MICROELECTRONICS PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 16 *;
 [A]WO9618937  (KENETECH WINDPOWER INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 5, line 21 - page 7, line 33; figures 1,3 *