EP2863749 - USE OF AN AGROCHEMICAL COMPOSITION WITH HERBICIDAL ACTION IN RAPESEED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | For all designated states Federal University of Rio Grande do Sul Avenida Paulo Gama 110 6° Andar Porto Alegre - RS / BR | For all designated states Federal University of Santa Maria Avenida Roraima n° 1000 Cidade Universitária Bairro Camobi Santa Maria - RS / BR | For all designated states Federal Technological University of Paraná Avenida Sete de Setembro n° 3165 Curitiba - PR / BR | For all designated states Federal University Foundation of Mato Grosso Avenida Fernando Correa da Costa n° 2367 Bairro Boa Esperanca Cuiabá - Mato Grosso / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states Federal University of Rio Grande do Sul Avenida Paulo Gama 110 6° Andar Porto Alegre - RS / BR | |||
For all designated states Federal University of Santa Maria Avenida Roraima n° 1000 Cidade Universitária Bairro Camobi Santa Maria - RS / BR | |||
For all designated states Federal Technological University of Paraná Avenida Sete de Setembro n° 3165 Curitiba - PR / BR | |||
For all designated states Federal University Foundation of Mato Grosso Avenida Fernando Correa da Costa n° 2367 Bairro Boa Esperanca Cuiabá - Mato Grosso / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEWEHR, Markus Goethestr. 21 56288 Kastellaun / DE | 02 /
ZAGAR, Cyrill 4520 Wingate Drive Raleigh, North Carolina 27609 / US | 03 /
PEOPLES, Scott 5732 Dutch Creek Drive Raleigh, North Carolina NC 27606 / US | 04 /
MEROTTO, Aldo, JR. Av. Pirapó 175. apto 502 Bairro Petrópolis CEP-90470-450 Porto Alegre - RS / BR | 05 /
VIDAL, Ribas Rua Faria Santos 466 - Apto 702 CEP-90670-150 Porto Alegre - RS / BR | 06 /
CARNEIRO GUIMARAES, Sebastiao Rua Sorocaba 30 Jardim Primavera CEP-78030-192 Cuiabá - MT / BR | 07 /
MUZELL TREZZI, Michelangelo Rua Joao Alves de Medeiros 438 85504-360 Pato Branco - PR / BR | 08 /
PINTO LAMEGO, Fabiane Tenente Lira 986 apt 203 Frederico Westphalen 98400-000 Rio Grande do Sul - RS / BR | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2015/18] | Application number, filing date | 13706046.3 | 27.02.2013 | WO2013EP53943 | Priority number, date | US201261605214P | 01.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261605214 P | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013127862 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2863749 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N61/00, A01P3/00, A01P13/00, A01P21/00 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
A01N61/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N61/00, A01N2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER AGROCHEMISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HERBIZIDER WIRKUNG IN RAPSSAMEN | [2015/18] | English: | USE OF AN AGROCHEMICAL COMPOSITION WITH HERBICIDAL ACTION IN RAPESEED | [2015/18] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION AGROCHIMIQUE AYANT UNE ACTION HERBICIDE SUR LE COLZA | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2014 | Observations by third parties | 26.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 01.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 28.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19915013 (NOVARTIS AG [CH]) [A] 1-16 * page 2, lines 3-6 * * page 2, lines 18-23 * * page 30, line 30 * * claims 1,7,25,26 *; | [I]EP0614607 (ZENECA LTD [GB]) [I] 1,7-9 * page 2, lines 12-15,19-23 * * example 1 * * claims 1-5 *; | [A]WO9406293 (ZENECA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-16 * claims 1-8 * * example 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * | by applicant | WO0215701 | EP0374753 | WO9307278 | WO9534656 | EP0427529 | EP0451878 | WO03018810 | WO03052073 | EP0392225 | US3060084 | EP0707445 | WO9113546 | US4172714 | US4144050 | US3920442 | US5180587 | US5232701 | US5208030 | GB2095558 | US3299566 | - Farm Chemicals Handbook, MEISTER PUBLISHING COMPANY, (2000), vol. 86 | - PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 61, page 246 | - PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 61, page 258 | - PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 61, page 277 | - PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 61, page 269 | - PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 61, page 286 | - PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 64, page 326 | - PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 64, page 332 | - WEED SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 57, page 108 | - AUSTRALIAN JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 58, page 708 | - SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 316, page 1185 | - BROWNING, "Agglomeration", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING, (19671204), pages 147 - 48 | - Perry's Chemical Engineer's Handbook, MCGRAW-HILL, (1963), pages 8 - 57 FF | - S. R. COLBY, "Calculating synergistic and antagonistic responses of herbicide combinations", WEEDS, (1967), vol. 15, page 22FF | - COLBY, S.R., "Calculating synergistic and antagonistic responses of herbicide Combinations", WEEDS, (1967), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22, XP001112961 | other | - ROBINSON D.E. ET AL, "TANK-MIXING STROBILURIN FUNGICIDES WITH METRIBUZIN, THIFENSULFORON AND RIMSULFORON IN TOMATO", ANNUAL MEETING PRESENTATION NORTH CENTRAL WEED SCIENCE SOCIETY, (2006), vol. 61, page 140, XP003033178 | - LANCASTER S H; ET AL, "INTERACTIONS OF CLETHODIM AND SETHOXYDIM WITH SELECTED AGRICHEMICALS APPLIED TO PEANUTS", WEED TECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 19, pages 456 - 461, XP003033179 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1614/WT-04-232R | - LANCASTER S.H. ET AL, "INFLUENCE OF SELECTED FUNGICIDES ON EFFICACY OF CLETHODIM AND SETHOXYDIM1", WEED TECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 397 - 403, XP003033170 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1614/WT-04-172R | - BAYER CROPSCIENCE, "ALL YOU NEED IN ONE FUNGICIDE", FANDANGO - GUIDE TO EFFECTIVE USE, (200503), pages 1 - 14, XP003033173 | - "AZOXYSTROBIN MAPP 5341", LIFESCIENTIFIC LEAF LABEL, (20110303), XP003033180 |