Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809291

EP2809291 - ADAPTOR FOR COUPLING TO A MEDICAL CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton Dickinson Holdings Pte. Ltd.
30 Tuas Avenue 2
Singapore 639461 / SG
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / CARREL, Franck
4 allée des Acacias
F-38800 Le Pont de Claix / FR
02 / MARITAN, Lionel
2 rue du Stade
F-38119 Pierre-Chatel / FR
03 / PEROT, Frederic
487 A Charriere Chaude
Les Balmets
38760 Saint Paul de Varces / FR
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Delorme, Nicolas , et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau
BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13706083.601.02.2013
[2016/03]
WO2013SG00045
Priority number, dateSG2012000077402.02.2012         Original published format: SG 201200774
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115731
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809291
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809291
Date:20.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61J1/14, A61J1/20
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ADAPTER ZUR KOPPLUNG AN EINEN MEDIZINISCHEN BEHÄLTER[2014/50]
English:ADAPTOR FOR COUPLING TO A MEDICAL CONTAINER[2014/50]
French:ADAPTATEUR À COUPLER À UN RÉCIPIENT MÉDICAL[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase02.09.2014National basic fee paid 
02.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
23.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2015Fee for grant paid
17.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.07.2015
Opposition(s)21.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.02.2013
AL20.01.2016
AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CY20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
MK20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
TR20.01.2016
IE01.02.2016
LU01.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU01.02.2013
AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CY20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
MK20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
TR20.01.2016
IE01.02.2016
LU01.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2018/31]HU01.02.2013
AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CY20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
MK20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
IE01.02.2016
LU01.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU01.02.2013
AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
MK20.01.2016
MT20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
IE01.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2017/47]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
MT20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
IE01.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2017/16]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SI20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
IE01.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
BG20.04.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2017/07]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
IE01.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT20.01.2016
BE20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/50]AT20.01.2016
CZ20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RO20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
SK20.01.2016
SM20.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
EE20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
MC20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT20.01.2016
DK20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
LV20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
RS20.01.2016
SE20.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
IS20.05.2016
PT20.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT20.01.2016
ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
IT20.01.2016
LT20.01.2016
PL20.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
Former [2016/35]ES20.01.2016
FI20.01.2016
HR20.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO20.04.2016
GR21.04.2016
Former [2016/24]BE29.02.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0152920  (JET MEDICA L L C [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 27, lines 26-27; figures 4,6 *;
 [A]US5829589  (NGUYEN TUAN V [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * figure 4 *