Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2809291 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380011618 EP13706083



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9180070Global Dossier 10.11.2015B2
US2015013810 15.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
SG2012007746 02.02.2012
WO2013SG00045 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101913893BGlobal Dossier 31.10.2018B1
KR20140138666 04.12.2014A
Priority number Date
SG2012007746 02.02.2012
WO2013SG00045 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6097768BGlobal Dossier 15.03.2017B2
JP2015506255 02.03.2015A
Priority number Date
SG2012007746 02.02.2012
WO2013SG00045 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104244903BGlobal Dossier 29.06.2016B
CN104244903 24.12.2014A
Priority number Date
SG2012007746 02.02.2012
WO2013SG00045 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2809291Global Dossier 20.01.2016B1
EP2809291 10.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
SG2012007746 02.02.2012
WO2013SG00045 01.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN6162DELNP2014 21.08.2015A
Priority number Date
SG2012007746 02.02.2012
WO2013SG00045 01.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013115731Global Dossier 08.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
SG2012007746 02.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG192312 30.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
SG2012007746 02.02.2012