Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2804975 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2804975



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 138
21.09.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.11.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.10.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.09.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
29.09.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
29.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.06.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.06.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
29.04.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
18.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
18.03.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
18.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
29.10.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.09.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
22.08.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
02.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
15.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.05.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
15.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 11
25.07.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
25.07.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 18
10.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
10.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
10.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
28.01.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
28.01.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 3
28.01.2013 Description International Searching Authority 10
28.01.2013 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
28.01.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 4