Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804975

EP2804975 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF DETERMINING THE ANGULAR POSITION OF A ROTATING ROLL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.09.2016
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stowe Woodward Licensco, LLC
8537 Six Forks Road, Suite 300
Raleigh, NC 27615 / US
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / CANTRELL, Clifford Bruce
191 Butler Lane
White Post, Virginia 22663 / US
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Parker, Andrew James , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Parker, Andrew James , et al
Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date13706086.916.01.2013
[2015/47]
WO2013US21745
Priority number, dateUS201261587361P17.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261587361 P
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013109629
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804975
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2804975
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:D21G9/00, D21F3/06, G01B21/22, G01D5/02, G01P15/00, G06F17/00
[2015/26]
Former International [2014/48]D21F3/06, D21F3/08, D21G1/02, G01B3/56, G01P15/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER WINKELPOSITION EINER ROTIERENDEN WALZE[2014/48]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD OF DETERMINING THE ANGULAR POSITION OF A ROTATING ROLL[2014/48]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA POSITION ANGULAIRE D'UN ROULEAU ROTATIF[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2014National basic fee paid 
15.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
18.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2015Fee for grant paid
29.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.06.2015
Opposition(s)19.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.01.2013
AL18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE16.01.2016
LU16.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/38]HU16.01.2013
BE18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE16.01.2016
LU16.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2018/31]HU16.01.2013
BE18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE16.01.2016
LU16.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU16.01.2013
BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
MT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE16.01.2016
LU16.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2017/47]BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE16.01.2016
LU16.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2017/07]BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE16.01.2016
LU16.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2017/03]BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
LU16.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
LU16.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/46]CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
LU16.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/42]CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
LU16.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
LU16.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/25]ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/24]ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2392728  (STOWE WOODWARD LICENSO LLC [US]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0014] - [0076] *;
 [A]EP2267219  (STOWE WOODWARD L L C [US]) [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0010] - [0042] *;
 [A]WO9625288  (STOWE WOODWARD LICENSCO INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * pages 9-19 *;
 [A]JP2000193551  (NON DESTRUCTIVE INSPECTION CO; OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * abstract *
by applicantUS5699729
 US2007111871
 US2005261115
 US5562027
 US699729
 US6981935
 US7572214
 US8236141
 US2011301003