Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810460

EP2810460 - METHOD AND APPARATUS TO SUPPORT M2M CONTENT AND CONTEXT BASED SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.05.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.06.2016  [2016/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DONG, Lijun
6085 African Holly Trail
San Diego, CA 92130 / US
02 / SEED, Dale, N.
229 N. 36th Street
Allentown, PA 18104 / US
03 / RUSSELL, JR., Paul, L.
8 Michael Way
Pennington, NJ 08534 / US
04 / WANG, Chonggang
9 Carlyle Court
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
05 / DING, Zongrui
5107 NW Crady Lane
Portland, OR 97229 / US
06 / LU, Guang
130 Highland Park Boulevard
Thornhill, Ontario L3T 1B7 / CA
07 / AKBARI, Mohsen
642 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 1115
Toronto, Ontario M2K 1B9 / CA
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Heinze, Ekkehard , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Widenmayerstrasse 47
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13706120.601.02.2013
WO2013US24351
Priority number, dateUS201261594629P03.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261594629 P
US201261653772P31.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261653772 P
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013116653
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810460
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/00
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON M2M-INHALT UND KONTEXTBASIERTE DIENSTE[2014/50]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS TO SUPPORT M2M CONTENT AND CONTEXT BASED SERVICES[2014/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE SUPPORTER UN CONTENU DE COMMUNICATION DE MACHINE À MACHINE ET SERVICES BASÉS SUR LE CONTEXTE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.09.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
20.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/25]
03.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2016/25]
Divisional application(s)EP15202293.5  / EP3024256
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.08.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2011112683  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0208] * * figures 1-26 *;
 [X]  - Etsi, "TR 102 966 V0.1.1 (2011-09) Machine to Machine Communications (M2M); Interworking between the M2M Architecture and M2M Area Network technologies;", ETSI, (20110916), pages 1 - 19, URL: http://docbox.etsi.org/M2M/M2M/05-CONTRIBUTIONS/2011/, (20130423), XP055060833 [X] 1-27 * section 5 Annex A.2 *
 [X]  - ERICSSON, "Use of XDMS for Resource Management in M2M", INTERNET CITATION, (20101110), pages 1 - 35, URL: http://docbox.etsi.org/M2M/Open/, (20120210), XP002669357 [X] 1-27 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SHELBY SENSINODE K HARTKE C BORMANN UNIVERSITAET BREMEN TZI B FRANK SKYFOUNDRY Z, "Constrained Application Protocol (CoAP); draft-ietf-core-coap-08.txt", CONSTRAINED APPLICATION PROTOCOL (COAP); DRAFT-IETF-CORE-COAP-08.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20111031), pages 1 - 88, XP015079121 [X] 1-27 * the whole document *
 [I]  - "ETSI TS 102 690 V1.1.1 Machine-to-Machine communications (M2M); Functional architecture", (20111001), URL: http://docbox.etsi.org, (20130327), XP055057930 [I] 1-27 * abstract * * sections 1-9 Annex A-F *