Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807469

EP2807469 - APPARATUS, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING MATTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
30.08.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tomra Sorting AS
Drengsrudhagen 2
1385 Asker / NO
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / BALTHASAR, Dirk
Mooshell 6
56154 Boppard / DE
02 / ONSRUD, Ole
Vestaveien 14
1476 Rasta / NO
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]01 / BALTHASAR, Dirk
Mooshell 6
56154 Boppard / DE
02 / ONSRUD, Ole
Vestaveien 14
N-1476 Rasta / NO
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Haag, Malina Anna
Awapatent AB
Södra Hamngatan 37-41
Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date13706315.224.01.2013
WO2013NO00001
Priority number, dateNO2012000007424.01.2012         Original published format: NO 20120074
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115650
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807469
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/84
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON MATERIALIEN[2014/49]
English:APPARATUS, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING MATTER[2014/49]
French:APPAREIL, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À DÉTECTER UNE MATIÈRE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2014National basic fee paid 
01.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
12.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.09.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6473168  (RUYMEN MARC [BE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,11,13,18 * the whole document * [I] 3-5,14,16;
 [XI]EP1698888  (TITECH VISIONSORT AS [NO]) [X] 1,6,7,9,13,18 * the whole document * [I] 2-5,14-17
by applicantUS6449036
 WO9844335
 US3176306