Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2807469 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2807469



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 99
03.09.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
03.09.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.03.2019 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
04.12.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.04.2015 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
12.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
12.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
01.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
01.07.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 2
01.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.06.2014 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 21
08.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
08.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 17
18.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
18.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 6