Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2807469


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.08.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
30.08.2019 First examination report
26.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.12.2015 Change - representative
27.03.2015 Change - inventor
27.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
14.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
23.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
31.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
22.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
06.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication