Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2807469 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380006071 EP13706315



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9557265Global Dossier 31.01.2017B2
US2014362382 11.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013NO00001 24.01.2013
NO20120074 24.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6209536BGlobal Dossier 04.10.2017B2
JP2015509194 26.03.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013NO00001 24.01.2013
NO20120074 24.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104067109BGlobal Dossier 22.03.2017B
CN104067109 24.09.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013NO00001 24.01.2013
NO20120074 24.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2807469Global Dossier 03.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013NO00001 24.01.2013
NO20120074 24.01.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2618764 11.05.2017C2
RU2014128890 20.03.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2013NO00001 24.01.2013
NO20120074 24.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013115650Global Dossier 08.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
NO20120074 24.01.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NO336441B 17.08.2015B1
NO20120074 25.07.2013A1
Priority number Date
NO20120074 24.01.2012