Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812186

EP2812186 - PRINT HEAD FOR STENCIL PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 27.02.2019  [2019/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illinois Tool Works Inc.
155 Harlem Avenue
Glenview, IL 60025 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / LYNCH, James
c/o Illinois Tool Works Inc.
155 Harlem Avenue
Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US
02 / DOYLE, Dennis G.
c/o Illinois Tool Works Inc.
155 Harlem Avenue
Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US
03 / KING, Kenneth
c/o Illinois Tool Works Inc.
155 Harlem Avenue
Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US
04 / PERAULT, Joseph A.
c/o Illinois Tool Works Inc.
155 Harlem Avenue
Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US
05 / KLAUSER, John George
c/o Illinois Tool Works Inc.
155 Harlem Avenue
Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Trinks, Ole
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 10 26 05
86016 Augsburg / DE
[2017/21]
Former [2014/51]Trinks, Ole
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
P.O. Box 102605
86016 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date13706341.807.02.2013
[2017/21]
WO2013US25017
Priority number, dateUS20121336894208.02.2012         Original published format: US201213368942
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119726
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812186
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2812186
Date:24.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B41F15/08, H05K3/12, B41F15/42
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRUCKKOPF FÜR SCHABLONENDRUCKER[2014/51]
English:PRINT HEAD FOR STENCIL PRINTER[2014/51]
French:TÊTE D'IMPRESSION POUR IMPRIMANTE AU POCHOIR[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase07.08.2014National basic fee paid 
07.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
07.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
06.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2017Fee for grant paid
13.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.01.2017
Opposition(s)27.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
RS24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
IE07.02.2018
LU07.02.2018
[2019/09]
Former [2018/52]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
RS24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
LU07.02.2018
Former [2018/44]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
RS24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/25]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
RS24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
RS24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
SM24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
RS24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
RS24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
RS24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
RS24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[IDY]US6955120  (PHAM-VAN-DIEP GERALD C [US] ET AL) [ID] 1-20 * figures 2,3,10-13 * * paragraphs [0030] , [0034] , [0040] - [0043] - [0047] * [Y] 1-20;
 [IDY]US6453810  (ROSSMEISL MARK [US] ET AL) [ID] 1-20 * figures 1-3,6 * * paragraphs [0071] , [0078] - [0081] * [Y] 1-20;
 [Y]EP1197267  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-20 * figures 3,4 * * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] *
by applicantUS5947022
 US6324973
 US6453810
 US6955120