Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812408

EP2812408 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF WELL BORE TAR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.10.2017  [2017/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
10200 Bellaire Boulevard
Houston, TX 77072 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
10200 Bellaire Boulevard
Houston, TX 77072 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Livanec, Philip Wayne
1809 Salem Dr.
Deer Park, Texas 77536 / US
02 / Perez, Greg Paul
2603 Hidden Creek Dr.
Pearland, Texas 77581 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Turner, Craig Robert
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date13706353.308.02.2013
WO2013US25252
Priority number, dateUS20121336863908.02.2012         Original published format: US201213368639
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119890
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812408
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:C09K8/12, C09K8/24, C09K8/524
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TEER IN EINEM BOHRLOCH[2014/51]
English:COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATMENT OF WELL BORE TAR[2014/51]
French:COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT D'UN GOUDRON DE PUITS DE FORAGE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2014National basic fee paid 
04.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
13.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/41]
29.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/41]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2009095534  (PEREZ GREGORY P [US]) [X] 1,2,4-20,22-28 * paragraphs [0028] , [0020] , [0027]; examples 2,3; claims 15,18,1,3,4 * [I] 3,21;
 [X]US2008214413  (EWANEK JOHN [CA]) [X] 1,18,28 * paragraphs [0025] , [0006]; example 2; claim 50 *;
 [X]US2006003899  (LEVEY SIMON J [CA] ET AL) [X] 1,18,28 * example 2; claim 12; table 3 *;
 [X]US2009011960  (WU AN MING [CA]) [X] 1,18,28 * paragraph [0022]; claims 26,31,32 *;
 [X]EP0626397  (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [X] 28 * example 1 *;
 [A]WO2011092491  (OILFLOW SOLUTIONS HOLDINGS LTD [GB]; FLETCHER PHILIP [GB]; CRABTREE MI) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010298173  (SMITH CLAYTON [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *