Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2839626

EP2839626 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR APPLICATION-AWARE ADMISSION CONTROL IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company, Ltd.
No. 8 Li-Hsin Road 6
Hsinchu Science Park
Hsinchu 300-78 / TW
[2017/16]
Former [2015/09]For all designated states
WI-LAN LABS, INC.
15090 Avenue of Science, Suite 103
San Diego CA 92128 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STANWOOD, Kenneth, L.
Suite 103
15090 Avenue of Science
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
02 / GELL, David
Suite 103
15090 Avenue of Science
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
03 / RODDY, Warren
Suite 103
15090 Avenue of Science
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
04 / BAO, Yiliang
Suite 103
15090 Avenue of Science
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
05 / XU, Haibo
Suite 103
15090 Avenue of Science
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
 [2019/37]
Former [2015/09]01 / STANWOOD, Kenneth, L.
Suite 103
15090 Avenue of Science
San Diego CA 92128 / US
02 / GELL, David
Suite 103
15090 Avenue of Science
San Diego CA 92128 / US
03 / RODDY, Warren
Suite 103
15090 Avenue of Science
San Diego CA 92128 / US
04 / BAO, Yiliang
Suite 103
15090 Avenue of Science
San Diego CA 92128 / US
05 / XU, Haibo
Suite 103
15090 Avenue of Science
San Diego CA 92128 / US
Representative(s)FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
[2019/37]
Former [2015/09]Coyle, Philip Aidan
F. R. Kelly & Co.
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
Application number, filing date13706362.408.02.2013
[2019/37]
WO2013US25409
Priority number, dateUS201261625459P17.04.2012         Original published format: US 201261625459 P
US201261640984P01.05.2012         Original published format: US 201261640984 P
US20131376164507.02.2013         Original published format: US201313761645
[2015/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013158201
Date:24.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/43]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2839626
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013
[2015/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2839626
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, H04L12/54
[2015/09]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/09]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR ANWENDUGS BEWUSSTE ZULASSUNGSSTEUERUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK[2019/17]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR APPLICATION-AWARE ADMISSION CONTROL IN A COMMUNICATION NETWORK[2015/09]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR UN CONTRÔLE D'ADMISSION COMPATIBLE AVEC UNE APPLICATION DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION[2015/09]
Former [2015/09]SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR ANWENDUNGSBEWUSSTE BERECHTIGUNGSSTEUERUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK
Entry into regional phase17.11.2014National basic fee paid 
17.11.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
17.11.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/09]
27.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2019Fee for grant paid
02.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
24.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2010138035  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]; LIDSTROEM MATTIAS [SE]; MATTI MONA [SE]) [X] 1-78 * abstract * * figure 6 * * claims 1,4,9 * * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 9 * * page 20, line 11 - line 28 *;
 [X]US2002188732  (BUCKMAN CHARLES R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-78 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0039] *;
 [A]US2005271048  (CASEY LIAM [CA]) [A] 1-78 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] *;
 [A]US2004013089  (TANEJA MUKESH [US] ET AL) [A] 1-78 * abstract * * paragraph [0175] - paragraph [0176] * * paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0191] * * paragraph [0348] * * claims 1,2 *