EP2812095 - COMBINATION OF ADSORBENTS FOR FILTERS OF COMBINED FIRE AND INDUSTRIAL EMERGENCY FILTER ESCAPE DEVICES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dräger Safety AG & Co. KGaA Revalstrasse 1 23560 Lübeck / DE | [2014/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMMANN, Klaus Schulstrasse 26 23611 Sereetz / DE | 02 /
WIRSCHAL, Julia Baareneichkoppel 4a 23617 Stockelsdorf / DE | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13706409.3 | 01.02.2013 | [2016/27] | WO2013DE00056 | Priority number, date | DE20121002113 | 06.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012002113 | [2014/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013117179 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2812095 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2812095 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/02, B01D53/62, A62B19/02, A62B23/00 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
B01D53/02 (EP);
B01D53/62 (EP);
B01J20/06 (EP);
B01J20/20 (EP);
B01J20/28052 (EP);
B01D2251/602 (EP);
B01D2253/102 (EP);
B01D2253/1124 (EP);
B01D2255/2073 (EP);
B01D2255/20761 (EP);
B01D2257/502 (EP);
B01D2259/4541 (EP);
B01J2220/42 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADSORBENTIENKOMBINATION FÜR FILTER KOMBINIERTER BRAND- UND INDUSTRIE-FLUCHTFILTERGERÄTE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2014/51] | English: | COMBINATION OF ADSORBENTS FOR FILTERS OF COMBINED FIRE AND INDUSTRIAL EMERGENCY FILTER ESCAPE DEVICES AND USE THEREOF | [2014/51] | French: | ASSOCIATION D'ADSORBANTS POUR FILTRES D'APPAREILS AUTOSAUVETEURS À FILTRE COMBINÉS POUR LA PROTECTION EN CAS D'INCENDIES ET D'ACCIDENTS INDUSTRIELS, ET UTILISATION DE CES APPAREILS | [2014/51] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 26.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 01.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2013 | AL | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | DK | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | ES | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | HR | 06.07.2016 | IT | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | MK | 06.07.2016 | MT | 06.07.2016 | NL | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | RS | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | SM | 06.07.2016 | TR | 06.07.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | NO | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | IE | 01.02.2017 | LU | 01.02.2017 | BE | 28.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 01.02.2013 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 01.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 01.02.2013 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 01.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.02.2013 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 01.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 06.07.2016 | |
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 01.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 01.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
IE | 01.02.2017 | ||
LU | 01.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
LU | 01.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | CZ | 06.07.2016 | |
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 06.07.2016 | |
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 06.07.2016 | |
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [I]US5058578 (WEISS ALVIN H [US]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 11 - column 5, line 40 *; | [A]WO02085426 (LERSCH ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, lines 11-24 * * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 16 * * page 5, lines 1-11 * * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 13 *; | [A]US5315987 (SWANN LINSEY [CA]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 2, lines 7-36 * * column 7, line 62 - column 8, line 5 * * column 8, lines 40-59 *; | [A]EP0124263 (TOYO CCI KK [JP]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 14 - page 4, line 26 * | by applicant | DE1067691 | DE10152785 |