Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2828734

EP2828734 - PRINTING FROM A CELLULAR PHONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.01.2017  [2017/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mwangi, Mary
P.O. Box 32821
Nairobi 00600 / KE
[2015/05]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP
Alder Castle
10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Application number, filing date13706756.717.01.2013
WO2013KE00030
Priority number, dateKE2012000152923.03.2012         Original published format: KE 152912
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013141413
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2828734
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/12
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
TitleGerman:DRUCKVORGANG MIT EINEM MOBILTELEFON[2015/05]
English:PRINTING FROM A CELLULAR PHONE[2015/05]
French:IMPRESSION À PARTIR D'UN TÉLÉPHONE CELLULAIRE[2015/05]
Entry into regional phase22.10.2014National basic fee paid 
22.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
02.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/01]
29.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/01]
Public notificationsInvitation to give notice of appointment of a professional representative (EPO Form 2502B dated 01/03/2016)
Mwangi, Mary
P.O. Box 32821
Nairobi 00600 / KE
[2016/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201503   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2015
31.01.201604   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2010144376  (PAWLECKI J BRENT [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-12 * the whole document * [I] 4,7,8,13;
 [X]WO2010128339  (SOFTWARE IMAGING GROUP LTD [GB]; SOORD GEOFFERY HAMMOND [GB]; WINWOOD) [X] 1-3,9-12 * page 14, line 25 - page 16, line 9 * * figures 5, 6 *