Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812792

EP2812792 - USING THE LEAST SIGNIFICANT BITS OF A CALLED FUNCTION'S ADDRESS TO SWITCH PROCESSOR MODES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / TABONY, Charles Joseph
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
02 / PLONDKE, Erich James
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
03 / CODRESCU, Lucian
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
04 / VENKUMAHANTI, Suresh K.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
05 / MENEZES, Evandro Carlos
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[2017/42]
Former [2014/51]Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date13706805.207.02.2013
[2017/42]
WO2013US25187
Priority number, dateUS201261595773P07.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261595773 P
US20121365549919.10.2012         Original published format: US201213655499
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119842
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812792
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2812792
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/30, G06F9/32
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG DER NIEDRIGSTWERTIGEN BITS EINER ADRESSE EINER GERUFENEN FUNKTION ZUM WECHSELN EINES PROZESSORMODUS[2014/51]
English:USING THE LEAST SIGNIFICANT BITS OF A CALLED FUNCTION'S ADDRESS TO SWITCH PROCESSOR MODES[2014/51]
French:UTILISATION DES BITS LES MOINS SIGNIFICATIFS D'UNE ADRESSE DE LA FONCTION APPELÉE EN VUE DE TRANSFÉRER LES MODES DE PROCESSEUR[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase02.07.2014National basic fee paid 
02.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
16.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.07.2017Fee for grant paid
03.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.09.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
12.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.07.2015
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IE07.02.2018
LU07.02.2018
IS18.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IE07.02.2018
LU07.02.2018
IS18.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
LU07.02.2018
IS18.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL18.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2010312991  (NORDEN ERIK K [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,12,22 * paragraph [0165] - paragraph [0167] * * paragraph [0226] - paragraph [0227] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0080] * [A] 2,3,11,13,14,16,18,19 [I] 7-10,20,21,23;
 [XAI]EP1065586  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,7,12,22 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0067] * [A] 2,11,13 [I] 8,10,20,21,23;
 [A]US6209079  (OTANI SUGAKO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,2 * column 7, line 18 - line 31 * * column 8, line 33 - line 39 * * column 9, line 8 - line 30 *;
 [X]GB2435116  (IMAGINATION TECH LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 11 - line 24 *;
 [A]GB2374694  (ADVANCED RISC MACH LTD [GB]) [A] 1-6,12-17,22,23 * page 1 - page 4 *;
 [A]US2006174089  (ALTMAN ERIK R [US] ET AL) [A] 1,2,12,13,22,23 * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0121] *