Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2812792 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2812792



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 427
22.08.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.10.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.09.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.09.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.09.2017 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
12.09.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.09.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
12.09.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
12.09.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
03.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
03.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
03.07.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
03.07.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
03.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.07.2017 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
27.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
27.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
17.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
07.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
07.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
07.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.06.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
17.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
07.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
07.03.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.11.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
23.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
23.11.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.11.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
23.07.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
23.07.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.07.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
16.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
16.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
16.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
16.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
16.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.09.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
02.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 13
02.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.07.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
23.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
19.05.2014 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 10
19.05.2014 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.05.2014 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
19.05.2014 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
19.05.2014 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.05.2014 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
25.04.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
25.04.2014 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
25.04.2014 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
28.02.2014 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
28.02.2014 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
28.02.2014 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
07.01.2014 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
02.01.2014 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
16.12.2013 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.12.2013 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.12.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
09.12.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
09.12.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
09.12.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
03.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49
15.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
15.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 28
29.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
29.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
29.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
21.02.2013 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
21.02.2013 Claims International Searching Authority 5
21.02.2013 Description International Searching Authority 15
21.02.2013 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
21.02.2013 Drawings International Searching Authority 6