Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813099

EP2813099 - ENABLING SECURE ACCESS TO A DISCOVERED LOCATION SERVER FOR A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / EDGE, Stephen William
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / WACHTER, Andreas Klaus
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
03 / HAWKES, Philip Michael
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Wagner, Karl H.
Wagner & Geyer
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13706827.608.02.2013
[2019/17]
WO2013US25446
Priority number, dateUS201261597713P10.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261597713 P
US20131376228007.02.2013         Original published format: US201313762280
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013120026
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2813099
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813099
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04W4/02, H04W4/20, H04W12/06, H04W8/02, H04W8/06
[2018/43]
Former International [2014/51]H04W12/06, H04W4/20, H04W4/02, H04W8/06, H04W8/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:GEWÄHRLEISTUNG EINES GESICHERTEN ZUGANGS ZU EINEM ERKANNTEN LOKALISIERUNGSSERVER FÜR EINE MOBILE VORRICHTUNG[2014/51]
English:ENABLING SECURE ACCESS TO A DISCOVERED LOCATION SERVER FOR A MOBILE DEVICE[2014/51]
French:AUTORISATION D'UN ACCÈS SÉCURISÉ À UN SERVEUR DE LOCALISATION RECHERCHÉ POUR UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase09.09.2014National basic fee paid 
09.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
24.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.02.2019Fee for grant paid
27.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.03.2019Information about intention to grant a patent
15.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.10.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL24.04.2019
[2019/44]
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2006104352  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [Y] 1-42 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraphs [0066] , [0073] * * paragraphs [0089] , [0097] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0119] *;
 [Y]WO03065754  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 1-12,14-26,28-39,41,42 * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 9 * * page 13, line 18 - page 14, line 12 * * page 15, line 6 - line 18 * * page 16, line 19 - page 17, line 6 *;
 [Y]EP1519604  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 9,10,25,38 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059] *;
 [Y]EP1653656  (XEROX CORP [US]) [Y] 13,27,40 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] * * paragraphs [0008] , [0015] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0065] *;
 [A]US2010234022  (WINTERBOTTOM JAMES [AU]) [A] 1-42 * paragraphs [0017] , [0023] , [0024] * * paragraphs [0040] , [0042] , [0043] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] *;
 [A]WO2007035736  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-42 * paragraphs [0008] , [0025] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0099] *;
 [A]US2002138632  (BADE STEVEN A [US], et al) [A] 9,10,25,38 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] *
 [X]  - Qualcomm, "User Plane location Protocol Draft Version 2.1 OMA-TS-ULP-V2_0-20120209", (20120209), pages 1 - 370, OMA, URL: http://member.openmobilealliance.org/ftp/Public_documents/LOC/2012/ OMA-LOC-2012-0028-CR_SUPL_2.1_TS_ULP_Security.zip, (20130807), XP002710498 [X] 1-42 * Chapters 5.2.8-5.2.9; page 135 - page 139 * * Chapter 6.1.5; page 205 * * Chapters 6.1.1.1-6.1.1.4; page 195 - page 198 * * Chapters 10.41-10.42; page 299 - page 301 *
 [X]  - Wachter A., Edge S., Hawkes P., "SUPL 2.1 TS ULP Security", (20120209), pages 1 - 3, OMA, Qualcomm, URL: http://member.openmobilealliance.org/ftp/Public_documents/LOC/2012/OMA-LOC-2012-0028-CR_SUPL_2.1_TS_ULP_Security.zip, (20130807), XP002710493 [X] 1-42 * the whole document *