EP2815596 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING TUNE-AWAY IN DUAL-SIM DUAL-STANDBY MOBILE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEENAGALA, Rajagopal 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
HANG, Ling 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
HSU, Chi-Ping 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13706860.7 | 14.02.2013 | WO2013US26007 | Priority number, date | US201261598431P | 14.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261598431 P | US201313766372 | 13.02.2013 Original published format: US201313766372 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013123101 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2815596 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/18, H04W88/06, // H04W48/18 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
H04W88/06 (EP,US);
H04W8/183 (EP,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | H04W8/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG EINER ABSCHALTUNG MIT EINER VORRICHTUNG MIT DOPPELTER SIM UND DOPPELTEM STANDBY | [2014/52] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING TUNE-AWAY IN DUAL-SIM DUAL-STANDBY MOBILE DEVICES | [2014/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT UN DÉTACHEMENT DANS DES DISPOSITIFS MOBILES À DEUX SIM ET DEUX POSITIONS D'ATTENTE | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 03.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 03.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2475094 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-40 * page 1, line 4 - line 7 * * page 2, line 1 - line 18 * * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 4 * * page 10, line 6 - line 11 ** page 10, line 23 - page 11, line 28 *; | [A]US2011217969 (SPARTZ MICHAEL K [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * |