Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2809328

EP2809328 - HYDROXYALKYL STARCH FOR THE TREATMENT OF HEAD AND NECK CANCERS BY REDUCTION OF TUMOR GROWTH RATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Else-Kröner-Strasse 1
61352 Bad Homburg / DE
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / WESTPHAL, Martin
Piemonter Weg 6
61350 Bad Homburg / DE
02 / BAASNER, Silke
Dittersdorfer Str. 42
61137 Schöneck / DE
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH
Patent Department
Borkenberg 14
61440 Oberursel / DE
[2014/50]
Application number, filing date13706932.430.01.2013
[2018/31]
WO2013EP51819
Priority number, dateEP2012015306830.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12153068
US201261592017P30.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261592017 P
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113765
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2809328
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2809328
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/718, A61P35/00, A61K45/06, A61K31/337, A61K31/4045, A61K31/7068
[2018/09]
Former International [2014/50]A61K31/718, A61P35/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:HYDROXYALKYLSTÄRKE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KOPF- UND HALSTUMOREN DURCH REDUKTION VON TUMORWACHSTUMSRATEN[2014/50]
English:HYDROXYALKYL STARCH FOR THE TREATMENT OF HEAD AND NECK CANCERS BY REDUCTION OF TUMOR GROWTH RATES[2014/50]
French:AMIDON HYDROXYALKYLÉ DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE CANCERS DE LA TÊTE ET DU COU PAR RÉDUCTION DES TAUX DE CROISSANCE TUMORALE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase23.07.2014National basic fee paid 
23.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
10.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2018Fee for grant paid
22.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.03.2016
Opposition(s)03.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
17.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
LU30.01.2019
[2019/44]
Former [2019/40]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/24]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT01.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]DE4023788  (SCHUMANN KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]US6207654  (ZIKRIA BASHIR [US] ET AL) [X] 10 * abstract *;
 [X]WO2012004009  (FRESENIUS KABI DE GMBH [DE]; KNOLLER HELMUT [DE]; HECKMANN DOMINIK [DE) [X] 1,10 * abstract *
by applicantDE4023788
 WO9640108
 WO03074088
 WO2012004005
 WO0048637
 US5502043
 EP1732953
 EP0402724
 US6680305
    - SOMMERMEYER ET AL., KRANKENHAUSPHARMAZIE, (1987), vol. 8, no. 8, pages 271 - 278
    - WEIDLER ET AL., ARZNEIMITTELFORSCHUNG/DRUG RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 41, pages 494 - 498
    - MOHAMED ET AL., EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF SURGICAL ONCOLOGY, (2003), vol. 29, pages 261 - 265
    - SOMMERMEYER ET AL., CHROMATOGRAPHIA, (1988), vol. 25, pages 167 - 168
    - C. JUNGHEINRICH ET AL., CLIN. PHARMACOKIN., (2005), vol. 44, no. 7, pages 681 - 699
    - J.-M. MISHLER, Pharmacology of hydroxyethyl starches, OXFORD MEDICAL PUBLICATIONS, (2002), vol. IV, pages 1 - 30
    - W.-M. KULICKE ET AL., STARCH, (1993), vol. 45, no. 12, pages 445 - 450
    - B. WITTGREN ET AL., INT. J. POLYM. ANAL. CHARACT., (2002), vol. 7, no. 1-2, pages 19 - 40
    - Y. M. LIU ET AL., CHIN. CHEM. LETT., (2002), vol. 13, no. 11, pages 1097 - 1099
    - W. BANKS ET AL., BR. J. PHARMAC., (1973), vol. 47, pages 172 - 178
    - O. LARM ET AL., STARCH, (1981), vol. 33, no. 7, pages 240 - 244
    - SOMMERMEYER ET AL., STARCH, (1992), vol. 44, no. 6, pages 215 - 218
    - YING-CHE LEE ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (1983), vol. 55, pages 334 - 338
    - K. L. HODGES ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (1979), vol. 51, page 2171
    - MOLICO ET AL., LEUKEMIA RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 28, no. 4, pages 321 - 324
    - SCHMIDT; CARMELIET, "Angiogenesis: A Target in Solid Tumors, Also in Leukemia?", HEMATOLOGY AM SOC HEMATOL EDUC PROGRAM., (2010), vol. 2011, pages 1 - 8
    - WAITZINGER ET AL., CLIN. DRUG INVEST., (1998), vol. 16, pages 151 - 160
    - JUNGHEINRICH ET AL., CLIN. PHARMACOKINET., (2006), vol. 44, no. 7, pages 681 - 699
    - SOMMERMEYER ET AL., KRANKENHAUSPHARMAZIE, (1987), vol. 8, no. 08, pages 271 - 278
    - A.N.BELDER; B.NORMAN, CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1969), vol. 10, pages 391 - 394