EP2805230 - METHOD FOR BACKING UP DIGITAL CINEMATOGRAPHIC CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONO FILMS 85 rue Vauvenargues 75018 Paris / FR | [2015/37] |
Former [2014/48] | For all designated states Simkine, Antoine 85 rue Vauvenargues 75018 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simkine, Antoine 85 rue Vauvenargues 75018 Paris / FR | [2015/37] |
Former [2014/48] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/48] | Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13707046.2 | 16.01.2013 | [2020/18] | WO2013IB50398 | Priority number, date | FR20120050508 | 18.01.2012 Original published format: FR 1250508 | [2014/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013108190 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2805230 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2805230 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/14, G03B27/00, H04N5/84, G11B7/003, G06F11/08, H04N21/433, H04N21/414 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
G03B27/00 (EP,US);
G11B20/1803 (US);
G11B20/00007 (US);
G11B20/10527 (US);
H04N5/843 (EP,US);
H04N5/917 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/48] | G06F7/14, G06F11/08, G11B7/003, H04N5/84, G03B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG DIGITALER KINEMATOGRAPHISCHER INHALTE | [2014/48] | English: | METHOD FOR BACKING UP DIGITAL CINEMATOGRAPHIC CONTENT | [2014/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SAUVEGARDE D'UN CONTENU CINÉMATOGRAPHIQUE NUMÉRIQUE | [2014/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 17.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2013 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | IE | 16.01.2021 | LU | 16.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 16.01.2013 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB684351 (KODAK LTD) [Y] 7 * page 2, line 60 - page 3, line 60; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP1158519 (QUANTUM CORP [US]) [Y] 4,6 * paragraph [0002] ** abstract *; | [Y]US2006093241 (NAKAMURA OSAMU [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0062]; figures 2-5 *; | [XY]GB2428130 (UNIV BASEL [CH]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * the whole document * [Y] 4,6,7; | [X]US2010295967 (ZURBUCHEN MARK ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2011070548 (HOSOYA YOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0005]; figure 5 * | Examination | EP1187476 | WO2010064118 | by applicant | EP1308857 | US2006045387 |