Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804653

EP2804653 - PATIENT INTERFACE DEVICE HAVING AN ENGINEERED SURFACE FOR PROVIDING LOW FRICTION AND IMPROVED COMFORT TO THE USER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.10.2014
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / HENDRIKS, Cornelis Petrus
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / VONCKEN, Rudolf Maria Jozef
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / POTZE, Willem
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / WILLARD, Nicolaas Petrus
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
05 / VAN ZANTEN, Joyce
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
06 / KLEE, Mareike
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Steffen, Thomas
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13707436.510.01.2013
WO2013IB50229
Priority number, dateUS201261586869P16.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261586869 P
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013108160
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2804653
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/06
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
TitleGerman:PATIENTENSCHNITTSTELLE VORRICHTUNG MIT MANIPULIERTER OBERFLÄCHE FÜR GERINGE REIBUNG UND VERBESSERTEN KOMFORT FÜR DEN BENUTZER[2014/48]
English:PATIENT INTERFACE DEVICE HAVING AN ENGINEERED SURFACE FOR PROVIDING LOW FRICTION AND IMPROVED COMFORT TO THE USER[2014/48]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INTERFACE PATIENT AYANT UNE SURFACE ÉLABORÉE POUR ASSURER UN FROTTEMENT FAIBLE ET UN CONFORT AMÉLIORÉ À L'UTILISATEUR[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2014National basic fee paid 
18.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]US7640933  (HO PETER [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,12,13 * abstract * * figure all * * column 2, line 3 - line 16 * * column 5, line 15 - column 6, line 37 * * column 8, line 7 - line 9 * [I] 3,4,6-8,11,14-17;
 [XA]US2011088699  (SKIPPER CHRISTOPHER SCOTT [AU], et al) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * figures 19a,19b,23a,23b,117-119,125,126,138 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0243] , [0244] , [0248] , [0393] , [0397] , [0469] * [A] 2-11,13-17
by applicantUS6851425
 US7069932