Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810172

EP2810172 - MULTI-BANK CACHE MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.08.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / LIANG, Jian
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / YU, Chun
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Howe, Steven
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Howe, Steven
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date13707465.423.01.2013
WO2013US22759
Priority number, dateUS20121336490102.02.2012         Original published format: US201213364901
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013116060
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810172
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F12/08, G06F13/16
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
TitleGerman:CACHESPEICHER MIT MEHREREN SPEICHERBANKEN[2014/50]
English:MULTI-BANK CACHE MEMORY[2014/50]
French:MÉMOIRE CACHE À MULTIPLES BLOCS DE MÉMOIRE[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
19.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.09.2019
27.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
11.09.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201907   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XAYI]US2011197028  (NIKARA JARI [FI] ET AL) [X] 8,15,22 * abstract * * figures 3, 4 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0004] * [A] 3-5,10-12,17-19,24-26 [Y] 1,2,6,7 [I] 9,13,14,16,20,21,23,27,28;
 [XYI]US2008140980  (MEI BINGFENG [CN] ET AL) [X] 8,15,22 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0020] * * figures 7, 21 * [Y] 1,2,6,7 [I] 9,13,14,16,20,21,23,27,28;
 [A]US2010268882  (CARGNONI ROBERT ALAN [US] ET AL) [A] 1,6,8,13,15,22,23,27 * abstract * * figures 2-5 *;
 [A]US2002065988  (LASSERRE SERGE [FR] ET AL) [A] 1,8,15,22 * abstract * * figures 1, 3A, 8A, 8C *