Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805587

EP2805587 - MODULATION OF LIGHT EMITTED BY A LIGHTING DEVICE, USING PLURALITY OF DIFFERENT MODULATION PERIODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Signify Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 48
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2019/11]
Former [2018/50]For all designated states
Philips Lighting Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 48
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2016/34]For all designated states
Philips Lighting Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 45
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / FERI, Lorenzo
c/o High Tech Campus 45
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / NIJSSEN, Stephanus Joseph Johannes
c/o High Tech Campus 45
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / GRITTI, Tommaso
c/o High Tech Campus 45
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / RAJAGOPALAN, Ruben
c/o High Tech Campus 45
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
05 / DE BRUIJN, Frederik Jan
c/o High Tech Campus 45
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2017/32]
Former [2014/48]01 / FERI, Lorenzo
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / NIJSSEN, Stephanus Joseph Johannes
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / GRITTI, Tommaso
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / RAJAGOPALAN, Ruben
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
05 / DE BRUIJN, Frederik Jan
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 44
NL-5656AE Eindhoven / NL
Representative(s)van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus , et al
Signify Netherlands B.V.
Intellectual Property
High Tech Campus 7
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2019/26]
Former [2014/48]van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13707712.914.01.2013
[2019/26]
WO2013IB50326
Priority number, dateUS201261587298P17.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261587298 P
US201261599459P16.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261599459 P
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013108167
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805587
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805587
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H05B37/02
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MODULATION DER LICHTSTRAHLUNG EINER BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT MEHREREN UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN MODULATIONSPERIODEN[2014/48]
English:MODULATION OF LIGHT EMITTED BY A LIGHTING DEVICE, USING PLURALITY OF DIFFERENT MODULATION PERIODS[2014/48]
French:MODULATION DE LA LUMIÈRE ÉMISE PAR UN DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE, EN UTILISANT PLUSIEURS DE FRÉQUENCES DE MODULATION[2019/03]
Former [2014/48]MODULATION DE LA LUMIÈRE ÉMISE PAR UN DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE EFFECTUÉE AU MOYEN D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE PÉRIODES DE MODULATION DIFFÉRENTES
Entry into regional phase18.08.2014National basic fee paid 
18.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
17.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.05.2019Fee for grant paid
14.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2006111930  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-24 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1, 4, 5 *;
 [I]WO2008050294  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1,12 * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 33 * * figure 1 *;
 [I]WO2008050293  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1 * page 2, line 12 - page 2, line 30 * * page 3, line 12 - page 3, line 16 * * page 5, line 3 - page 5, line 30 * * figure 1 *;
 [I]WO2010116299  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1 * page 12, line 10 - page 12, line 22 * * figures 1, 2 * * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 30 *;
 [I]WO2007099472  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 22 * * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 23 *;
 [I]US6198230  (LEEB STEVEN B [US], et al) [I] 1 * column 7, line 37 - column 7, line 46 * * column 8, line 7 - column 8, line 14 * * page 9, line 20 - page 9, line 31 * * page 9, line 42 - page 9, line 48 * * figure 1 * * page 6, line 37 - page 6, line 49 *;
 [I]EP2088836  (LEDON LIGHTING JENNERSDORF [AT]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0065] * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0056] *;
 [I]WO2009090511  (TIR TECHNOLOGY LP [CA], et al) [I] 1,20 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0015] *
by applicantEP1159149
 EP1115914