Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2826121

EP2826121 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ARRANGEMENT FOR SUPPLYING ELECTRIC CURRENT TO A POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wobben Properties GmbH
Borsigstrasse 26
26607 Aurich / DE
[2016/01]
Former [2015/04]For all designated states
Wobben Properties GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BEEKMANN, Alfred
Am Park 30
26639 Wiesmoor / DE
 [2015/04]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[2015/04]
Application number, filing date13708190.708.03.2013
WO2013EP54794
Priority number, dateDE20121020422016.03.2012         Original published format: DE102012204220
[2015/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013135592
Date:19.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2826121
Date:21.01.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013
[2015/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/14, H02J3/28, H02J3/38
[2015/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/04]
Extension statesBA16.10.2014
ME16.10.2014
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER ANORDNUNG ZUM EINSPEISEN ELEKTRISCHEN STROMS IN EIN VERSORGUNGSNETZ[2015/04]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ARRANGEMENT FOR SUPPLYING ELECTRIC CURRENT TO A POWER SUPPLY SYSTEM[2015/04]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME POUR ALIMENTER UN RÉSEAU D'ALIMENTATION EN COURANT ÉLECTRIQUE[2015/04]
Entry into regional phase16.10.2014National basic fee paid 
16.10.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.10.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
07.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2010048706  (NEXT HYDROGEN CORP [CA]; STEMP MICHAEL [CA]; HINATSU JIM [CA]; STEWART) [X] 1-3,6-10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,2; claims 20,21 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028] * [I] 4,5;
 [X]EP1739824  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-3,5; claims 1-6 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] *;
 [XI]WO03077398  (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * page 8, line 13 - page 15, line 15; figure 3 * [I] 4,5;
 [A]US2008001479  (DENGEL ANDREAS [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1; claims 1-12 *
by applicantUS6984898
 US6891281
 US7462946
 US6965174
 US7525208
 EP2411669
 DE102009018126
 DE102008052827