|
16.08.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2023 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.06.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.02.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
20.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
23.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.01.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.01.2023 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2023 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.11.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.09.2022 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2022 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.05.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2021 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.05.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2021 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2021 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.03.2018 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Prior Art documents |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2016 |
Prior Art documents |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2016 |
Prior Art documents |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Prior Art documents |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Prior Art documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Prior Art documents |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
05.01.2016 |
Prior Art documents |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
01.12.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Prior Art documents |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.09.2015 |
Prior Art documents |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Prior Art documents |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Prior Art documents |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.10.2014 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2014 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.07.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
18 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |