Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2817064

EP2817064 - SYSTEMS FOR MODIFYING IMPEDANCE ALONG ELECTRICAL PATHS OF ELECTRICAL STIMULATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/01]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MODIFYING IMPEDANCE ALONG ELECTRICAL PATHS OF ELECTRICAL STIMULATION SYSTEMS
[2017/03]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.10.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation
25155 Rye Canyon Loop
Valencia, CA 91355 / US
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / MURTONEN, Salomo
3159 Piccolo Street
Pasadena, CA 91107 / US
02 / CARBUNARU, Rafael
11916 Otsego Street
Valley Village, CA 91607 / US
03 / BOCEK, Joseph, M.
857 East Gwinn Place
Seattle, WA 98102 / US
04 / GUPTA, Gaurav
28160 Mcbean Parkway
7104
Valencia, CA 91354 / US
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2017/46]
Former [2015/01]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13708315.022.02.2013
[2017/46]
WO2013US27298
Priority number, dateUS201261602881P24.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261602881 P
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013126682
Date:29.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2817064
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2817064
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/08, A61N1/375
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME ZUR ÄNDERUNG DER IMPEDANZ ENTLANG ELEKTRISCHER PFADE VOM ELEKTRISCHEN STIMULATIONSSYSTEMEN[2017/03]
English:SYSTEMS FOR MODIFYING IMPEDANCE ALONG ELECTRICAL PATHS OF ELECTRICAL STIMULATION SYSTEMS[2017/03]
French:SYSTÈMES POUR MODIFIER L'IMPÉDANCE LE LONG DES PASSAGES ÉLECTRIQUES DE SYSTÈMES DE STIMULATION ÉLECTRIQUE[2017/03]
Former [2015/01]SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÄNDERUNG DER IMPEDANZ ENTLANG ELEKTRISCHER PFADE VOM ELEKTRISCHEN STIMULATIONSSYSTEMEN
Former [2015/01]SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MODIFYING IMPEDANCE ALONG ELECTRICAL PATHS OF ELECTRICAL STIMULATION SYSTEMS
Former [2015/01]SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR MODIFIER L'IMPÉDANCE LE LONG DES PASSAGES ÉLECTRIQUES DE SYSTÈMES DE STIMULATION ÉLECTRIQUE
Entry into regional phase15.09.2014National basic fee paid 
15.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
31.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2017Fee for grant paid
29.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.06.2016
Opposition(s)17.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
LU22.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2018/52]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SI15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
LU22.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
Former [2018/44]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
MC15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RO15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
PL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
SM15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT15.11.2017
CY15.11.2017
CZ15.11.2017
DK15.11.2017
EE15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
SK15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT15.11.2017
ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
HR15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
LV15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
RS15.11.2017
SE15.11.2017
BG15.02.2018
NO15.02.2018
GR16.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES15.11.2017
FI15.11.2017
LT15.11.2017
NL15.11.2017
NO15.02.2018
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP2322242  (PACESETTER INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 14-15 * * paragraphs [0062] - [0065] - [0097] - [0115] * [Y] 20;
 [XY]WO2009117599  (GREATBATCH LTD [US]; STEVENSON ROBERT A [US]; TRUEX BUEHL E [US]; BREN) [X] 1,14 * paragraphs [0299] - [0306]; figure 114 * [Y] 20;
 [Y]WO2008100319  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]; ZHAO JENNIFER J [US]; LITOW MICAH A [US]; IYER RAJ) [Y] 20 * figure 2 *;
 [XP]WO2012112490  (BOSTON SCIENT NEUROMODULATION [US]; MURTONEN SALOMO [US]) [XP] 1-15,20 * figures 4-6 * * pages 11-16 *;
 [A]US2011029036  (YAMAMOTO JOYCE K [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15,20 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6181969
 US6516227
 US6609029
 US6609032
 US6741892
 US7244150
 US7672734
 US7761165
 US7949395
 US7974706
 US8175710
 US8224450
 US2005165465
 US2007150036
 US7437193