Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2817942

EP2817942 - INTERNET PROTOCOL CONNECTIVITY OVER A SERVICE-ORIENTED ARCHITECTURE BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / MAHENDRAN, Arungundram Chandrasekeran
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / CHAUBEY, Nishith K.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / LUO, Xun
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/24]Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2015/01]Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad
Wagner & Geyer
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date13708559.315.02.2013
[2018/24]
WO2013US26479
Priority number, dateUS20121340088921.02.2012         Original published format: US201213400889
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013126292
Date:29.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2817942
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2817942
Date:13.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, H04L29/12
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTERNETPROTOKOLLKONNEKTIVITÄT ÜBER EINEN BUS MIT DIENSTORIENTIERTER ARCHITEKTUR[2015/01]
English:INTERNET PROTOCOL CONNECTIVITY OVER A SERVICE-ORIENTED ARCHITECTURE BUS[2015/01]
French:CONNECTIVITÉ DE PROTOCOLE INTERNET SUR UN BUS À ARCHITECTURE ORIENTÉE SERVICE[2015/01]
Entry into regional phase16.09.2014National basic fee paid 
16.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
22.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
24.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2018Fee for grant paid
30.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.01.2016
Opposition(s)14.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.06.2018
CY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
DK13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
IT13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
MC13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SI13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
SM13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
[2019/45]
Former [2019/26]AT13.06.2018
CY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
DK13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
IT13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SI13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
SM13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/11]AT13.06.2018
CY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
IT13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
SM13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT13.06.2018
CY13.06.2018
CZ13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
PL13.06.2018
RO13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
SK13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/09]CY13.06.2018
EE13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/08]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
IS13.10.2018
Former [2019/03]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
NL13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
Former [2018/52]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
GR14.09.2018
Former [2018/51]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
LV13.06.2018
RS13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
Former [2018/50]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
HR13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
Former [2018/49]CY13.06.2018
ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
SE13.06.2018
BG13.09.2018
NO13.09.2018
Former [2018/47]ES13.06.2018
FI13.06.2018
LT13.06.2018
NO13.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]US7174363  (GOLDSTEIN NEAL L [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,16,18,21-23,31,32,42,44,46-48 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 14 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 52 * * column 9, line 6 - column 13, line 31 * * figure 7 * [I] 3-15,17,19,20,24-30,33-41,43,45,49,50;
 [I]US2005027871  (BRADLEY WILLIAM [US] ET AL) [I] 1-50 * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0084] - [0133] * * paragraphs [0174] - [0241] *;
 [I]WO2010041914  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-50 * paragraphs [0003] - [0081] * * figure 5 *
 [XI]  - MIKE P PAPAZOGLOU ET AL, "Service oriented architectures: approaches, technologies and research issues", THE VLDB JOURNAL ; THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL ON VERY LARGE DATA BASES, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20070303), vol. 16, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00778-007-0044-3, ISSN 0949-877X, pages 389 - 415, XP019519922 [X] 1,2,16,18,21-23,31,32,42,44,46-48 * Sections 1-4 * [I] 3-15,17,19,20,24-30,33-41,43,45,49,50

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00778-007-0044-3