Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2817998

EP2817998 - WIRELESS SYSTEM CONTROL FOR A SPECIFIC GEOGRAPHICAL AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/01]METHOD&APPARATUS FOR WIRELESS SYSTEM CONTROL
[2018/52]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.12.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[2018/16]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / CALIN, Doru
600-700 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
02 / KAYA, Aliye, Ozge
600-700 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
03 / YANG, Kai
600-700 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
04 / YIU, Simon
600-700 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Wilhelmstraße 7
65185 Wiesbaden / DE
[2015/01]
Application number, filing date13708604.726.02.2013
WO2013US27707
Priority number, dateUS201261603361P26.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261603361 P
US20121353930330.06.2012         Original published format: US201213539303
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013126923
Date:29.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/35]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2817998
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013
[2015/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/02
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSE SYSTEMSTEUERUNG FÜR EIN SPEZIFISCHES GEOGRAFISCHES GEBIET[2018/52]
English:WIRELESS SYSTEM CONTROL FOR A SPECIFIC GEOGRAPHICAL AREA[2018/52]
French:COMMANDE DE SYSTÈME SANS FIL POUR UNE ZONE GÉOGRAPHIQUE SPECIFIQUE[2018/52]
Former [2015/01]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DRAHTLOSEN SYSTEMSTEUERUNG
Former [2015/01]METHOD&APPARATUS FOR WIRELESS SYSTEM CONTROL
Former [2015/01]PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE SYSTÈME SANS FIL
Entry into regional phase26.09.2014National basic fee paid 
26.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
23.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2018Date of oral proceedings
13.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201907   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2009115554  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,12,13 * abstract * * page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 29 * * page 16, line 9 - page 21, line 20 * * page 22, line 11 - page 23, line 10 * * page 25, line 1 - page 26, line 23 * * page 29, lines 27,28 * * page 33, line 30 - page 34, line 3; figures 1,3 * [Y] 3,4,14 [I] 9-11;
 [IY]WO2011105938  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [I] 1,2,5-13 * abstract * * page 2, lines 24-31 * * page 4, lines 1-15 * * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 26; figure 2 * [Y] 3,4,14;
 [A]EP1617598  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0046] - [0048] *
 [A]  - LOUAI SAKER ET AL, "Minimizing Energy Consumption via Sleep Mode in Green Base Station", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE (WCNC), 2010 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100418), ISBN 978-1-4244-6396-1, pages 1 - 6, XP031706438 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * chapter I, chapter II.B, chapter V *