Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819643

EP2819643 - SUNSCREEN COMPOSITION COMPRISING UV COMPOSITE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.06.2019  [2019/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / TANNER, Paul, Robert
One Procter&Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45201 / US
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Engisch, Gautier
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
IP Patent Department
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[2015/02]
Application number, filing date13708638.501.03.2013
[2017/42]
WO2013US28578
Priority number, dateUS201261605535P01.03.2012         Original published format: US 201261605535 P
[2015/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013130948
Date:06.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2819643
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013
[2015/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2819643
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/894, A61K8/37, A61Q17/04, A61K8/06
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SONNENSCHUTZZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT UV-VERBUNDSTOFF[2015/02]
English:SUNSCREEN COMPOSITION COMPRISING UV COMPOSITE[2015/02]
French:COMPOSITION DE PROTECTION SOLAIRE COMPRENANT UN COMPOSITE UV[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase06.08.2014National basic fee paid 
06.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
11.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2017Fee for grant paid
06.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2017
Opposition(s)19.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
IE01.03.2018
LU01.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
FR31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/12]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
IE01.03.2018
LU01.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
Former [2019/09]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
IE01.03.2018
LU01.03.2018
Former [2019/04]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
LU01.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
MC18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SI18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RO18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
IT18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
PL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
SM18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT18.10.2017
CZ18.10.2017
DK18.10.2017
EE18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
SK18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT18.10.2017
ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
HR18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
LV18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
RS18.10.2017
SE18.10.2017
BG18.01.2018
NO18.01.2018
GR19.01.2018
IS18.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES18.10.2017
FI18.10.2017
LT18.10.2017
NL18.10.2017
NO18.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL18.10.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004228821  (SUNKEL JORGE MAX [US] ET AL) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007130412  (MOMENTIVE PERFORMANCE MAT INC [US]; NICHOLSON JOHN [US]; CZECH ANNA MA) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1426027  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]; SAKUTA KOJI [JP]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5236986
 US5387417
 US5412004
 US5811487
 US2006013791
 US2006034875
 US2010183525
 US2010172849
 US2010158824
 US5654389
 US6262170
 US6872401
 US3755560
 US4421769
 US7713519
 US5993789
 US6113931
 US6126925
 US6284916
 US7357919
 US2003108492
 US2003157035
 US2010183529
 US2008145324
 US2004057912
 US2004057914
 US2004057916
 US2004062726
 US2005220727
 US2008019930
 US2007185038
 US2006275237
 US2004175347
 US2006263309
 US2007020220
 US2010112100