Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2819549 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2819549



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 196
29.11.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
13.09.2016 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
17.03.2016 Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant Search / examination 1
10.03.2016 Request for correction of client data Search / examination 1
24.02.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.02.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.02.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.02.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
19.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
19.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
19.11.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
18.11.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.11.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
18.11.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
11.11.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.11.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.11.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.07.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.07.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.12.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.11.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
17.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.10.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.09.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
26.09.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 18
26.09.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.09.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
11.07.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
24.09.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 7
06.09.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
06.09.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 29
02.05.2013 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
02.05.2013 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
15.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
15.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
15.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
19.03.2013 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable PCT receiving Office 1
28.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
28.02.2013 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
28.02.2013 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
28.02.2013 Description PCT receiving Office 18
28.02.2013 Drawings PCT receiving Office 6