Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2819549


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.12.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  04.01.2017  [2017/01]
18.08.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
18.03.2016 Change - applicant published on  20.04.2016  [2016/16]
23.02.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.11.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.11.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.07.2015 First examination report
01.05.2015 Change - extension states published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
26.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
05.12.2014 Request for examination filed published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
14.10.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.2014 Amendment by applicant
27.09.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
09.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication