Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2819549 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201380022516 EP13708759



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015026890Global Dossier 29.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP54091 28.02.2013
DE102012101624 28.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104271002BGlobal Dossier 16.01.2018B
CN104271002 07.01.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP54091 28.02.2013
DE102012101624 28.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2819549Global Dossier 07.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP54091 28.02.2013
DE102012101624 28.02.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013127952Global Dossier 06.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
DE102012101624 28.02.2012