Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819549

EP2819549 - EMERGENCY POWER SUPPLY DEVICE FOR AN ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE FOR A PIECE OF FURNITURE, ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE, AND A CORRESPONDING PIECE OF FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.01.2017  [2017/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststrasse 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2016/16]
Former [2015/02]For all designated states
Dewertokin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HILLE, Armin
Neuer Brink 10
33659 Bielefeld / DE
02 / SCHRÖDER, Thomas
Pfingstweg 13
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/02]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13708759.928.02.2013
WO2013EP54091
Priority number, dateDE20121010162428.02.2012         Original published format: DE102012101624
[2015/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013127952
Date:06.09.2013
Language:DE
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819549
Date:07.01.2015
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013
[2015/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:A47C20/04
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
TitleGerman:NOTSTROMVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN ELEKTROMOTORISCHEN MÖBELANTRIEB FÜR EIN MÖBEL, ELEKTROMOTORISCHER MÖBELANTRIEB, UND EIN ENTSPRECHENDES MÖBEL[2015/02]
English:EMERGENCY POWER SUPPLY DEVICE FOR AN ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE FOR A PIECE OF FURNITURE, ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE, AND A CORRESPONDING PIECE OF FURNITURE[2015/02]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION D'URGENCE POUR UN MÉCANISME D'ACTIONNEMENT PAR MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN MEUBLE, MÉCANISME D'ACTIONNEMENT PAR MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE, ET MEUBLE CORRESPONDANT[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2014National basic fee paid 
26.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
10.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/01]
19.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2017/01]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE29821395U  (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7,8,13-15 * abstract * * page 1, lines 13-16 * * page 4, lines 12-20 * * page 6, lines 9-10 * [Y] 3,5,6,9,11,12,16;
 [Y]DE8804417U  (NIKO GESELLSCHAFT FÜR ANTRIEBSTECHNIK MBH) [Y] 5,16 * page 4, lines 24-32 *;
 [Y]WO2010102629  (LINAK AS [DK], et al) [Y] 3,6 * page 6, paragraphs 46,53 *;
 [Y]DE20314217U  (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [Y] 9 * page 3, lines 4-7 *;
 [Y]DE202009005020U  (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [Y] 11,12 * page 3, paragraph 16 *
by applicantDE8804417U
 DE29821395U