Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812817

EP2812817 - REPRODUCING DEVICE, METHOD THEREOF, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
07.10.2019Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-1 Konan 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA, Keiichiro
c/o SONY ENGINEERING CORPORATION
3-3-1 Tsujidou Shinmachi
Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0042 / JP
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB
Amalienstraße 62
80799 München / DE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date13708917.331.01.2013
WO2013JP00522
Priority number, dateJP2012002503608.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012025036
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013118472
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812817
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F16/44, G06F16/64
[2019/45]
Former International [2014/51]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
TitleGerman:WIEDERGABEVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN DAFÜR UND PROGRAMM[2014/51]
English:REPRODUCING DEVICE, METHOD THEREOF, AND PROGRAM[2014/51]
French:DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION, PROCÉDÉ DE CELUI-CI ET PROGRAMME[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase03.09.2014National basic fee paid 
03.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
09.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.07.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004215657  (DRUCKER STEVEN M [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0027] , [0032] , [0033] , [0037] , [0040] , [0054] , [0063]; figures 7,8 *;
 [X]US2010153846  (ROY GILLES [CA]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0027] , [0030]; figures 2,3,4,32,33 *;
 [A]US2007255747  (LEE KWANG-HYEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0017] , [18.36] , [0038] , [0039] *;
 [A]WO2008051643  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, line 24 - line 31 *
by applicantJP2009181644