Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801136

EP2801136 - SLIDING TYPE CLAMP AND CLAMP UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yazaki Corporation
4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8333 / JP
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIDA, Hiroyuki
c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd.
2464-48 Washizu
Kosai-shi Shizuoka 431-0431 / JP
02 / TOHYAMA, Eiichi
c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd.
2464-48 Washizu
Kosai-shi Shizuoka 431-0431 / JP
03 / OGA, Tatsuya
c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd.
2464-48 Washizu
Kosai-shi Shizuoka 431-0431 / JP
04 / INAO, Shinichi
c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd.
2464-48 Washizu
Kosai-shi Shizuoka 431-0431 / JP
05 / SUGURO, Masaaki
c/o Yazaki Parts Co. Ltd.
2464-48 Washizu
Kosai-shi Shizuoka 431-0431 / JP
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date13708923.115.02.2013
[2016/01]
WO2013JP54423
Priority number, dateJP2012003231417.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012032314
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013122263
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2801136
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801136
Date:30.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/53]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02G3/32, B60R16/02
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERSCHIEBBARES KLEMME UND KLEMMEINHEIT[2014/46]
English:SLIDING TYPE CLAMP AND CLAMP UNIT[2014/46]
French:ATTACHE DE TYPE COULISSANT ET UNITÉ DE SERRAGE[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase05.08.2014National basic fee paid 
05.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
03.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.10.2015Fee for grant paid
30.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.07.2015
Opposition(s)03.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.02.2013
AL30.12.2015
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
IE15.02.2016
LU15.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU15.02.2013
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
TR30.12.2015
IE15.02.2016
LU15.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2018/38]HU15.02.2013
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
BG30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE15.02.2016
LU15.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2018/31]HU15.02.2013
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CY30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE15.02.2016
LU15.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU15.02.2013
AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MK30.12.2015
MT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE15.02.2016
LU15.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/47]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
MT30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE15.02.2016
LU15.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/16]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SI30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE15.02.2016
LU15.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/07]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
IE15.02.2016
LU15.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT30.12.2015
BE30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU15.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
DK30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU15.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/43]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
LU15.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/42]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
MC30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
SM30.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
IS30.04.2016
PT02.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT30.12.2015
CZ30.12.2015
EE30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
IT30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
PL30.12.2015
RO30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
SK30.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/35]CZ30.12.2015
ES30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ30.12.2015
FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/30]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
NL30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/25]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
LV30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/24]FI30.12.2015
HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
BE29.02.2016
NO30.03.2016
GR31.03.2016
Former [2016/23]HR30.12.2015
LT30.12.2015
RS30.12.2015
SE30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
Former [2016/21]LT30.12.2015
NO30.03.2016
Former [2016/20]LT30.12.2015
Cited inInternational search[AD]JPH07310721  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) [AD] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]FR2778280  (PEUGEOT [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPH07310721