Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815500

EP2815500 - ELECTRIC WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change - applicantpublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koki Holdings Co., Ltd.
15-1, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-6020 / JP
[2019/38]
Former [2018/43]For all designated states
Koki Holdings Co., Ltd.
15-1, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo
1086020 / JP
Former [2018/33]For all designated states
Koki Holdings Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1, Konan 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd.
15-1, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-6020 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAKANO, Yasushi
c/o Hitachi Koki Co. LTD.
1060 Takeda
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP
02 / HORIE, Yuki
c/o Hitachi Koki Co. LTD.
1060 Takeda
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP
03 / TOMITA, Hirohisa
c/o Hitachi Koki Co. LTD.
1060 Takeda
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP
04 / FUNABASHI, Kazuhiko
c/o Hitachi Koki Co. LTD.
1060 Takeda
Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Parker, Andrew James , et al
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 47
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date13708924.915.02.2013
WO2013JP54427
Priority number, dateJP2012003107215.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012031072
JP2012003107315.02.2012         Original published format: JP 2012031073
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013122266
Date:22.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2815500
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013
[2014/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02P3/14
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHE ARBEITSMASCHINE[2014/52]
English:ELECTRIC WORKING MACHINE[2014/52]
French:MACHINE DE TRAVAIL ÉLECTRIQUE[2014/52]
Entry into regional phase13.08.2014National basic fee paid 
13.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/52]
02.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9963643  (MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 5 - page 17; figure - * [Y] 5-11;
 [YDA]WO2011086945  (HITACHI KOKI KK [JP]; FUNABASHI KAZUHIKO [JP]; TAKANO NOBUHIRO [JP]) [YD] 5-11 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0109]; figure - * [A] 1-4;
 [A]US2002158593  (HENDERSON JEFFERY L [US] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * figure -; claim - *;
 [XI]WO2006068482  (ELECTRISCHE APP NFABRIEK CAPAX [NL]; BUREMA HEINO MARTEN [NL]; PAS GER) [X] 1 * page 1, line 9 - page 5, line 18; figure - * [I] 2-11;
 [XI]US2005052145  (CARRIER DAVID A [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050]; figure - * [I] 2-11;
 [XA]US2006005673  (LONG CHARLES K [US] ET AL) [X] 12 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0034]; figure - * [A] 13-17
by applicantJP2011142859