Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807572

EP2807572 - MULTI-LANE HIGH-SPEED INTERFACES FOR HIGH SPEED SYNCHRONOUS SERIAL INTERFACE (HSI), AND RELATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / SHACHAM, Assaf
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego California 92121 / US
02 / GIL, Amit
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego California 92121 / US
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2016/12]Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2014/49]Roche, Dermot , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date13708933.025.01.2013
[2016/12]
WO2013US23308
Priority number, dateUS20121335831225.01.2012         Original published format: US201213358312
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112946
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807572
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807572
Date:23.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/42
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEHRSPURIGE HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSSCHNITTSTELLEN FÜR SCHNELLE SYNCHRON-SERIELLE SCHNITTSTELLE (HSI) SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN[2014/49]
English:MULTI-LANE HIGH-SPEED INTERFACES FOR HIGH SPEED SYNCHRONOUS SERIAL INTERFACE (HSI), AND RELATED SYSTEMS AND METHODS[2014/49]
French:INTERFACES À GRANDE VITESSE ET À BANDES MULTIPLES POUR INTERFACE SYNCHRONE SÉRIE À GRANDE VITESSE (HSI), ET SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS APPARENTÉS[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase24.06.2014National basic fee paid 
24.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
12.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2016Fee for grant paid
18.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.10.2015
Opposition(s)02.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL23.03.2016
AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2017/47]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
MC23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/37]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SI23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/19]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
BG23.06.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/07]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
DK23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2017/03]AT23.03.2016
BE23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2016/51]AT23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
PT25.07.2016
Former [2016/50]AT23.03.2016
CZ23.03.2016
EE23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RO23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
SK23.03.2016
SM23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE23.03.2016
HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
PL23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/48]HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
IS23.07.2016
Former [2016/39]HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
LV23.03.2016
RS23.03.2016
SE23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/36]HR23.03.2016
LT23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Former [2016/35]HR23.03.2016
NO23.06.2016
GR24.06.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2009327539  (KANERVA TOMMI [FI] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [I]US2009248978  (SOLOMON GARY [US] ET AL) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * figure 2 *