Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812793

EP2812793 - FLOATING POINT CONSTANT GENERATION INSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / PLONDKE, Erich James
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
02 / CODRESCU, Lucian
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
03 / TABONY, Charles Joseph
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
04 / BALASUBRAMANIAN, Swaminathan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[2016/39]
Former [2014/51]Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date13708942.108.02.2013
[2016/39]
WO2013US25401
Priority number, dateUS20121336969309.02.2012         Original published format: US201213369693
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013119995
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812793
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2812793
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/30
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANWEISUNGEN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON GLEITKOMMAKONSTANTEN[2014/51]
English:FLOATING POINT CONSTANT GENERATION INSTRUCTION[2014/51]
French:INSTRUCTION DE GÉNÉRATION DE CONSTANTE À VIRGULE FLOTTANTE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2014National basic fee paid 
03.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
16.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2016Fee for grant paid
16.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.05.2016
Opposition(s)29.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.02.2013
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
MK28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
MT08.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU08.02.2013
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CY28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
MT08.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2019/31]HU08.02.2013
AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
MT08.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/47]AL28.09.2016
AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
MT08.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/43]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
MT08.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/13]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
IE08.02.2017
LU08.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2018/04]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
LU08.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SI28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
Former [2017/48]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
MC28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
DK28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT28.09.2016
BE28.09.2016
CZ28.09.2016
EE28.09.2016
ES28.09.2016
FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
IT28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
PL28.09.2016
RO28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
SK28.09.2016
SM28.09.2016
BG28.12.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
IS28.01.2017
PT30.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
LV28.09.2016
NL28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
GR29.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI28.09.2016
HR28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
RS28.09.2016
SE28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI28.09.2016
LT28.09.2016
NO28.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT28.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[XAI]US2006112160  (ISHII MASAAKI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-10,12-17,19 * the whole document * [A] 11 [I] 18;
 [A]US2002184282  (YUVAL GIDEON A [US] ET AL) [A] 1,7,15,18,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5940311  (DAO TUAN Q [US] ET AL) [A] 1,7,15,18,19 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9712317  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 1,7,15,18,19 * the whole document *