Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819923

EP2819923 - APPARATUS FOR FORMING PACKAGES AND FILLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.12.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / PALLOTTA, Shawn, Christopher
479 Bunchberry Drive
Maineville, Ohio 45039 / US
02 / ORNDORFF, Jason, Matthew
21590 Georgetown Rd
Lawrenceburg, Indiana 47025 / US
03 / BROAD, Gavin, John
6984 Zenith Ct.
Liberty Township, Ohio 45011 / US
04 / MCLAUGHLIN, Jon, Kevin
7903 Woodglen Drive
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
05 / TECLEAB, Adal, Amine
1645 Spring Park Walk
Cincinnati, Ohio 45215 / US
06 / BREITHAUPT, Cullen, Joseph
1012 Crest Circle
Cincinnati, Ohio 45208 / US
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/16]Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2015/02]Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H.
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date13709001.526.02.2013
[2018/16]
WO2013US27774
Priority number, dateUS201261604072P28.02.2012         Original published format: US 201261604072 P
[2015/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013130453
Date:06.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819923
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013
[2015/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2819923
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:B65B41/18, B65B9/04
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERPACKUNGEN SOWIE FÜLLSYSTEM[2015/02]
English:APPARATUS FOR FORMING PACKAGES AND FILLING SYSTEM[2015/02]
French:APPAREIL DE FORMATION DE PAQUETS ET SYSTÈME DE REMPLISSAGE[2015/02]
Entry into regional phase23.07.2014National basic fee paid 
23.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
22.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2018Fee for grant paid
06.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.06.2015
Opposition(s)21.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
MC18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
[2019/45]
Former [2019/26]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SI18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
SM18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL18.04.2018
AT18.04.2018
CZ18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RO18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
SK18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
EE18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL18.04.2018
DK18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
PT20.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
GR19.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
LV18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
RS18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
HR18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
PL18.04.2018
SE18.04.2018
BG18.07.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL18.04.2018
FI18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL18.04.2018
LT18.04.2018
NL18.04.2018
NO18.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL18.04.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]US3475878  (WEST CARL J JR) [X] 1,3,4 * column 3, line 49 - column 6, line 16; figures 1,2 * [I] 2
ExaminationUS3345795
 JPS54165263U
by applicantWO2004033301
 US2005183394
 EP1375351