Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2829103

EP2829103 - METHOD FOR TESTING A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INCLUDING A STATION AND AN ACCESS POINT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2016/50]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / VAN DOORSELAER, Karel
Graaf de Fienneslaan 68
B-2650 Edegem / BE
02 / VAN OOST, Koen
Eenamelaan 17
B-2150 Borsbeek / BE
03 / DUMET, Sylvain
729 Barossa Valley Drive NW
Concord, North Carolina 28027 / US
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2016/50]
Former [2015/05]Arnold, Klaus-Peter
Deutsche Thomson OHG
European Patent Operations
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date13709211.014.03.2013
[2016/50]
WO2013EP55275
Priority number, dateEP2012030532019.03.2012         Original published format: EP 12305320
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013139679
Date:26.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2829103
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013
[2015/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2829103
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/06, H04L12/26, // H04W84/12
[2016/18]
Former International [2015/05]H04W24/06, H04W84/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN EINES DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERKS MIT EINER STATION UND EINEM ZUGRIFFSPUNKT[2015/05]
English:METHOD FOR TESTING A WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INCLUDING A STATION AND AN ACCESS POINT[2015/05]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR TESTER UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL COMPRENANT UNE STATION ET UN POINT D'ACCÈS[2016/18]
Former [2015/05]PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À TESTER UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL COMPRENANT UNE STATION ET UN POINT D'ACCÈS
Entry into regional phase05.09.2014National basic fee paid 
05.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
04.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.11.2016Fee for grant paid
03.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.07.2015
Opposition(s)15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.03.2013
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CY14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
MK14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
IE14.03.2017
LU14.03.2017
MT14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU14.03.2013
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CY14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
IE14.03.2017
LU14.03.2017
MT14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2019/31]HU14.03.2013
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
IE14.03.2017
LU14.03.2017
MT14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/43]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
IE14.03.2017
LU14.03.2017
MT14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
IE14.03.2017
LU14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/10]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
LU14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
IT14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
ES14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/34]CZ14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/31]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV14.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2003161341  (WU MILES [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0051] *;
 [A]US2010246416  (SINHA AMIT [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0048] *
ExaminationEP2642783